Hypefortype Ltd. v. Immediate Media Company North America, Inc.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Frederic Block |
Referred: | James Orenstein |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03758 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 19, 2017 4:07 AM EST |
Defendant
Immediate Media Company North America, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Hypefortype Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 67 minutes ago |
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Report on Copyright AO121
Fri 10/13 9:37 AM
Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. |
|
Att: 1 Order granting Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (electronic) (Rocco, Christine | ||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 10/04 10:07 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Granting plaintiff's motion7 for dismissal. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/4/2017. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Mon 10/02 7:20 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Voluntary with Prejudice by Hypefortype Ltd.. (Martinez, Frank) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 08/16 11:02 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hypefortype Ltd.. Immediate Media Company North America, Inc. waiver sent on 8/15/2017, answer due 10/16/2017. (Martinez, Frank) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Report on Copyright AO121
Thu 06/22 4:16 PM
Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Rocco, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 29 pgs complaint | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 06/22 3:36 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 06/22 3:35 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/22 3:34 PM
Summons Issued as to Immediate Media Company North America, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
29
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/22 9:59 AM
COMPLAINT against IMMEDIATE MEDIA COMPANY NORTH AMERICA filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9624934 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Hypefortype Ltd.. (Martinez, Frank) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/22 3:33 PM
Case assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |