Ramirez v. Berryhill
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brian M Cogan |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03759 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 30, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 11/15 7:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Peck on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (aty to be noticed) (Peck, Jason) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 10/30 10:58 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT dated 10/27/17 that pursuant to the fourth sentence of 42:405(g), the Commissioners decision is reversed; and that Plaintiffs claims are remanded for further proceedings, including reevaluation of plaintiffs obesity and reassessment of medical opinion pursuant to 20 C.F.R 404.1527 and 416.927, and providing plaintiff the opportunity for a hearing and to submit additional evidence. ( Ordered by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 10/27/2017 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 10/27 2:31 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF REMAND.( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/27/2017 *Forwarded for jgm. (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Fri 10/27 10:57 AM
Letter to the Honorable Brian M. Cogan, enclosing for Your Honor's signature, a stipulation and order of remand by Nancy A. Berryhill (Callahan, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 stipulation and order of remand | ||
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Mon 10/23 4:19 PM
Letter to the Honorable Brian M. Cogan, enclosing the courtesy copy of the administrative record by Nancy A. Berryhill (Callahan, Karen) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Transcript Administrative (Social Security Appeal)
Mon 10/23 4:15 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT (Social Security Appeal) (Callahan, Karen) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/21 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sally DeLuca on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (DeLuca, Sally) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 08/18 11:03 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Administrative Record and respectfully requesting approval of the proposed amended briefing schedule by Nancy A. Berryhill. (Callahan, Karen) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 08/18 3:14 PM
ORDER granting in part9 . Commissioner to serve and file the administrative record by 10/23/2017; plaintiff's motion due 12/8/2017; defendant's cross-motion due 1/22/2018. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/18/2017. (Weisberg, Peggy) |
||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 07/31 11:36 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed on behalf of Brenda Mejias Ramirez. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/24/2017. ( See 2nd page.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/03 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Karen T. Callahan on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (aty to be noticed) (Callahan, Karen) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 06/26 3:51 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Courtesy copies of the Summons, the Court's Order and Plaintiff's Complaint sent to the United States Attorney General; United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York; and General Counsel at SSA.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/23 3:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER dated 6/23/17 granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Summary of schedule. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/23/2017 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 06/22 3:44 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 06/22 3:42 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 06/22 12:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brenda Mejias Ramirez. (Khan, Shafaq) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/22 11:33 AM
COMPLAINT Brenda Mejias Ramirez against Nancy A. Berryhill Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Brenda Mejias Ramirez. (Khan, Shafaq) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/22 3:40 PM
Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |