Minzer v. Basil LLC et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William F Kuntz, II |
Referred: | Ramon E Reyes, Jr |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03765 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability) |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 19, 2017 3:58 AM EST |
Defendant
1034, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Basil LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aryeh Minzer
1546 East 12th Street, Apt.2
Brooklyn, NY 11230 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 04/18 4:26 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the above-captioned action is dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 4/18/2018. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 04/18 10:44 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff having failed to prosecute this action or otherwise object to the recommendation of Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. that this action be dismissed, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned action be DISMISSED without prejudice. SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 4/16/2018. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 03/27 4:51 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable: Transcript dated 2/23/2018. Postal Notation: Return to Sender, Unclaimed, Unable to forward. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Transcript | ||
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Transcript
Mon 02/26 11:03 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 23, 2018, before Judge Reyes. Court Transcriber: TypeWrite Word Processing Service, Telephone number 518-581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 3/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2018. (Rocco, Christine) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 02/23 3:36 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Telephone Conference held on 2/23/2018. Appearances by Adam Gross, Esq. for the Defendant. No appearance by Plaintiff. Ruling on the record recommending that this case be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff has 14 days from receipt of the transcript of this conference to file an objection. (FTR Log #3:02:05-3:08:07 (208N)) (Strong, Ardis) |
||
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 01/08 5:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Copy of Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr.'s January 5, 2018 Order served on Aryeh Minzer, Plaintiff Pro Se on 1/8/2018, filed by Basil LLC. (Gross, Adam) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 01/05 4:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Telephone Conference held on 1/5/2018. Appearances by Adam Simeon Gross, Esq. for the Defendant. No appearance by Plaintiff. Telephone Conference set for 2/23/2018 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. If plaintiff fails to appear, a report will be issued recommending the case be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Defendants' counsel is directed to promptly serve copies of this Order on Plaintiff by regular and certified mail and file proof of service with the clerk of the court. (FTR Log #3:05:47-3:13:04 (208N).) (Strong, Ardis) |
||
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 11/27 2:14 PM
ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 1/5/2018 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Defendant's counsel to initiate the call and dial in chambers @(718) 613-2120 once all parties are on the line. If plaintiff fails to appear, a report will be issued recommending the case be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/27/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 10/10 11:46 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable: Order13 dated 9/6/17 and docket sheet returned. Postal Notation: Return to Sender, Unclaimed, Unable to forward. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 09/06 5:29 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Erik Mathew Bashian are hereby permitted to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff forthwith and shall have no further obligation in this matter. Plaintiff shall, within thirty (3O) days of the signing of this Order, retain new counsel,and said new counsel is to file a written appearance on behalf of said Plaintiff. In the alternative.Plaintiff shall appear prose. In the interim, all deadlines are stayed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/6/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 08/22 6:26 PM
First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Aryeh Minzer. (Bashian, Erik) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 08/01 1:00 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Basil LLC. (Gross, Adam) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/01 12:59 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Basil LLC (Gross, Adam) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
order
Order to Answer
Tue 07/18 9:39 AM
ORDER TO ANSWER re9 Letter filed by Basil LLC. Defendant Basil LLC answer is due 8/1/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 7/18/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter
Mon 07/17 4:02 PM
Letter Requesting Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Basil LLC (Gross, Adam) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/17 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Simeon Gross on behalf of Basil LLC (aty to be noticed) (Gross, Adam) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/29 4:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aryeh Minzer. 1034, LLC served on 6/27/2017, answer due 7/18/2017. (Bashian, Erik) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/29 4:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aryeh Minzer. Basil LLC served on 6/27/2017, answer due 7/18/2017. (Bashian, Erik) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 06/22 4:04 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 06/22 4:04 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/22 4:03 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Att: 1 1034 LLC summons | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 06/22 2:35 PM
Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Aryeh Minzer (Bashian, Erik) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons vs. Defendant 1034, LLC, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/22 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9626276 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Aryeh Minzer. (Bashian, Erik) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/22 4:00 PM
Case assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |