Weisman v. Fuoco Group, LLP
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Denis R Hurley |
Referred: | Arlene R Lindsay |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03764 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 19, 2017 3:56 AM EST |
Defendant
Lou J. Fuoco
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fuoco Group, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christine Weisman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
14
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Mon 08/21 9:24 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Remand to State Court: The stipulation of remand to the Supreme Court, Nassau County is So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 8/21/2017. (Gapinski, Michele) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Remand to State Court
Fri 08/18 12:57 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lou J. Fuoco, Fuoco Group, LLP. (Briton, Roger) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Wed 07/05 9:48 AM
ORDER terminating6 Motion to Remand to State Court: This motion was filed in violation of this Court's Individual Practice Rules which require a pre-motion conference letter. Given that moving papers have been served, the Court wiaves its requirement for a pre-motion conference and sets the following brieifng schedule for the motion to remand: defendant shall serve, but not file, opposition papers on or before August 2, 2017; plaintiff shall serve reply papers, if any, and file all papers with the Court (including refiling its original moving papers), and provide Chambers with a courtesy copy of all papers, on or before August 21, 2017. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 7/5/2017. (Gapinski, Michele) |
||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Remand to State Court
Fri 06/30 4:56 PM
First MOTION to Remand to State Court County of Nassau by Christine Weisman. (Cohen, Avinoam) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Remand, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Lanny Weisman - Verified Answer and Counterclaims, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Defendants' Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Defendants' Amended Complaint - Lanny Weisman, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Proposed Stipulation | ||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/29 10:39 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Lou J. Fuoco, Fuoco Group, LLP. (Briton, Roger) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 06/23 11:07 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Fri 06/23 11:01 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/23 11:06 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen) |
||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/22 2:05 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by FUOCO GROUP, LLP (Briton, Roger) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 06/22 1:54 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Supreme Court of New York, County of Nassau, case number 604810/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9626141) (Briton, Roger) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit (Exhibit A - State Court Complaint) |