Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Fuentes-Osorio et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Pedro A Delgado-Hernande |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01836 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 21, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 19, 2017 5:21 AM AST |
Defendant
Juana Fuentes-Lopez
|
|
Defendant
Hector Fuentes-Osorio
Villas de Rio Grande AD20 Calle 24
Rio Grande, PR 00745 |
|
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Fuentes-Fuentes
|
|
Defendant
Hector Fuentes-Navarro
|
|
Defendant
Iris Fuentes-Navarro
|
|
Defendant
Lydia Fuentes-Navarro
|
|
Defendant
Victor Fuentes-Navarro
|
|
Defendant
John Doe and Richard Roe as unknown heirs of the Estate of Hector Fuentes Osorio
|
|
Defendant
The Estate of Hector Fuentes Osorio composed by Hector Fuentes Fuentes, Juana Fuentes Lopez and John Doe and Richard Roe as unknown heirs; Juana Fuentes Lopez
|
|
Plaintiff
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
order
Judgment
Thu 02/21 10:36 AM
JUDGMENT: See attached. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/21/2019. (ebb) |
|
38 | 38
order
Order on Informative Motion
Thu 02/21 10:30 AM
ORDER: Granting37 "Motion Requesting Voluntary Dismissal." Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/21/2019. (ebb) |
|
Saturday, February 09, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Informative Motion
Sat 02/09 4:17 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding request for voluntary dismissal filed by Marjaliisa Colon-Villanueva on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Responses due by 2/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion In Compliance
Fri 02/01 10:20 AM
ORDER: Granting35 "Motion In Compliance and for Extension of Time." Unless extreme circumstances beyond plaintiff's reasonable control dictate otherwise, the court will not grant any further extensions. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 2/11/2019. By 2/11/2019, plaintiff shall also submit a certified translation of the document included as Exhibit 1 of its motion. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/1/2019. (LMR) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
motion
In Compliance
Thu 01/31 9:06 PM
Motion In Compliance with Court Order and Final Request for Extension filed by Marjaliisa Colon-Villanueva on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Responses due by 2/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order on Informative Motion Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 01/16 5:55 PM
ORDER: Noting and Granting33 "Informative Motion and for Extension of Time." Notice of compliance due by 1/31/2019. The court is not inclined to grant additional extensions. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/16/2019. (LMR) |
|
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Informative Motion Extension of Time
Fri 01/11 12:17 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion, MOTION for extension of time filed by Marjaliisa Colon-Villanueva on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Responses due by 1/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Informative Motion Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 12/12 6:04 PM
ORDER: Noting and Granting31 "Informative Motion and for Extension of time." Notice of compliance due by 1/11/2018. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/12/2018. (LMR) |
|
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Informative Motion Extension of Time
Tue 12/11 6:38 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion, MOTION for extension of time filed by Marjaliisa Colon-Villanueva on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Responses due by 12/26/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Informative Motion Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 11/21 9:42 AM
ORDER: Noting and Granting29 "Motion to Inform and Request an Extension of Time to Comply with Court Order." Notice of compliance due by 12/11/2018. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/21/2018. (LMR) |
|
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Informative Motion Extension of Time
Thu 11/15 7:39 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion, MOTION for extension of time to Comply with Court order Docket 28 filed by Marjaliisa Colon-Villanueva on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Responses due by 11/29/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit II | ||
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Wed 10/24 7:36 PM
ORDER: Denying without prejudice26 "Motion for Default Judgment." Foreclosures are brought in this district under diversity jurisdiction. Pursuant to Puerto Rico law, an estate does not have juridical personality. All heirs must be included in suits against the estate. From the motion, it appears that plaintiff has identified at least some members of the Estate, but no efforts to identify any other members of the estate were included in the exhibits (for example, a judicial declaration of heirship to ascertain the identities of all the heirs of the Estate). To the contrary, plaintiff seeks to pursue its claims against those possible members of the estate as "John Doe," and "Richard Doe" without naming them as defendants. Plaintiff must show that it has met its burden of including all heirs by November 16, 2018. Otherwise, it shall show cause as to why the case should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction or administratively closed pending plaintiff's submission of the judicial declaration of heirs. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/24/2018. (LMR) |
|
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Informative Motion
Wed 05/16 5:50 PM
ORDER: Noting25 "Informative Motion." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 5/16/2018. (LMR) |
|
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Default -Judgment
Thu 05/10 3:38 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants filed by Marjaliisa Colon-Villanueva on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Responses due by 5/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 proposed judgment | ||
25 | 25
motion
Informative Motion
Thu 05/10 2:35 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Defendants Military Status filed by Marjaliisa Colon-Villanueva on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Responses due by 5/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 02/15 11:10 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB upon Hector Fuentes-Navarro served on 1/14/2018, answer due 2/5/2018. (Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
23 | 23
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 02/15 11:02 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB upon Iris Fuentes-Navarro served on 1/14/2018, answer due 2/5/2018. (Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
22 | 22
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 02/15 10:59 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB upon Lydia Fuentes-Navarro served on 1/14/2018, answer due 2/5/2018. (Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
21 | 21
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 02/15 10:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB upon Victor Fuentes-Navarro served on 1/14/2018, answer due 2/5/2018. (Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
service
Summons Issued
Mon 12/18 12:12 PM
Summons Issued as to Hector Fuentes-Navarro, Victor Fuentes-Navarro, Iris Fuentes-Navarro, Lydia Fuentes-Navarro (bgl) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion In Compliance
Fri 12/15 5:09 PM
ORDER: Granting in part and Denying in part15 "Motion In Compliance and to Inform and Request..." The leave to amend the complaint is granted. The request for summons by publication included at par. 9 is denied without prejudice of being refiled including legal grounds in support of the request and supporting documents. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/15/2017. (LMR) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order on Informative Motion
Fri 12/15 5:06 PM
ORDER: Noting and Denying14 "Informative Motion." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/15/2017. (LMR) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 12/14 8:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hector Fuentes-Navarro, Victor Fuentes-Navarro, Iris Fuentes-Navarro, Lydia Fuentes-Navarro, John Doe and Richard Roe as unknown heirs of the Estate of Hector Fuentes Osorio, Juana Fuentes-Lopez, filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB.(Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Summons as to Hector Fuentes Navarro, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Summons Victor Fuentes Navarro, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Summons Iris Fuentes Navarro, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Summons Lydia Fuentes Navarro, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Summons by Publication | ||
16 | 16
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 12/14 7:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB upon Juana Fuentes-Lopez served on 12/7/2017, answer due 12/28/2017. (Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
15 | 15
motion
In Compliance
Thu 12/14 7:49 PM
Motion In Compliance with Court order, To Inform and In Request for Issuance of New Summons as to 10 Order on Informative Motion,, filed by Marjaliisa Colon-Villanueva on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Responses due by 12/28/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit II | ||
14 | 14
motion
Informative Motion
Thu 12/14 6:42 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Motion to Request Entry of Order to Secure Property filed by Marjaliisa Colon-Villanueva on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Responses due by 12/28/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion requesting Order
Mon 12/04 3:35 PM
ORDER: Denied as unsupported12 "Motion to Secure Property Subject to Foreclosure." The exhibit states that the property is secured. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/4/2017. (ebb) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Requesting Order
Fri 12/01 5:23 PM
MOTION requesting Order To Secure Property filed by Marjaliisa Colon-Villanueva on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Responses due by 12/15/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Informative Motion
Tue 11/21 11:41 AM
ORDER: Noting8 "Informative Motion Submitting Document." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/21/2017. (LMR) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order on Informative Motion
Tue 11/21 11:40 AM
ORDER: Granting in part and Denying in part6 "Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint and for Issuance of Summons by Publication." The request for leave to amend the complaint is granted. The request for issuance of summons by publication is denied without prejudice. The diligences carried out by the process server to obtain the identities and locate the member of the estate appear to be insufficient. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/21/2017. (LMR) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion In Compliance
Tue 11/21 11:36 AM
ORDER: Noting5 "Motion In Compliance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/21/2017. (LMR) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Informative Motion
Mon 11/20 6:42 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Sworn Statement of Debt filed by Marjaliisa Colon-Villanueva on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Responses due by 12/4/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 11/20 6:03 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Estate of Hector Fuentes Osorio composed by Hector Fuentes Fuentes, Juana Fuentes Lopez and John Doe and Richard Roe as unknown heirs; Juana Fuentes Lopez, filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB.(Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Summons | ||
6 | 6
motion
Informative Motion
Mon 11/20 5:45 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Request for amended complaint and new summons by publication filed by Marjaliisa Colon-Villanueva on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Responses due by 12/4/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
5 | 5
motion
In Compliance
Mon 11/20 4:27 PM
Motion In Compliance as to 4 Order filed by Marjaliisa Colon-Villanueva on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Responses due by 12/4/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Mon 11/13 3:58 PM
ORDER: By 11/20/2017, plaintiff shall inform the court of the status of the case. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/13/2017.(LMR) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/23 10:21 AM
Summons Issued as to Juana Fuentes-Lopez, Hector Fuentes-Osorio, The Conjugal Partnership composed by Hector Fuentes Osorio and Juana Fuentes Lopez (arg) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Fri 06/23 9:39 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/22 9:29 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5496167.), filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, as Indenture, for the CSMC 2016-PR1 Trust, Mortgage -Backed NOtes, Series 2016-PR1. Service due by 9/20/2017,(Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
Att: 1 Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Mortgage Note, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Mortgage Deed, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Loan Modification, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit title search, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit SCRA, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons |