Ayala-Garcia v. USA
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Francisco A Besosa |
Referred: | Camille L Velez-Rive |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01838 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment
Thu 04/04 3:31 PM
JUDGMENT dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 04/04/2019. (brc) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 04/04 1:40 PM
ORDER re9 Motion to Dismiss: GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 04/04/2019. (brc) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Vacate
Thu 04/04 1:33 PM
ORDER re1 Motion to Vacate: DENIED, pursuant to the court of appeals' judgment filed at docket no. 8. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 04/04/2019. (brc) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 04/03 4:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Johnny Ayala-Garcia filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA Responses due by 4/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza, Mariana) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/03 3:03 PM
COPY of JUDGMENT of USCA as to Johnny Ayala-Garcia (2) entered on 04/02/19; Petitioner seeks leave to file a second or successive 28 U.S.C. § 2255 motion featuring a challenge to one or more 18 U.S.C. § 924(c) convictions under Johnson v. United States, 135 S. Ct. 2551 (2015) (Johnson II), and related precedent. Accordingly, the application for leave to file a second or successive § 2255 motion is DENIED. Th[is]... denial of an authorization... to file a second or successive application shall not be appealable and shall not be the subject of a petition for rehearing or for a writ of certiorari. (xi) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Fri 08/17 10:58 AM
ORDER. The Motion in Compliance (Docket No. 6) is noted. Pursuant to Petitioner's request in Docket No. 6, this case continues stayed pending a ruling by the Court of Appeals of the First Circuit on his motion for leave to file a second or successive motion to vacate his sentence. Once the stay is lifted, the Government will be afforded a period of time to file its response to Docket No. 1. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 08/17/2018. (cvr) |
|
6 | 6
motion
In Compliance Informative Motion
Fri 08/17 8:11 AM
Motion In Compliance as to 5 Order,, INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Status of this Case filed by Franco Lorenzo Perez-Redondo on behalf of Johnny Ayala-Garcia Responses due by 8/31/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Redondo, Franco) |
|
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Fri 08/10 10:56 AM
ORDER. Petitioner is granted ten (10) days to inform the status of this case. Failure to comply with this order may the dismissal of this case with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 08/10/2018. (cvr) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Fri 06/23 1:51 PM
ORDER. Pursuant to Petitioner's request in Docket No. 1, this case is stayed pending a ruling by the Court of Appeals of the First Circuit on his motion for leave to file a second or successive motion to vacate his sentence. Once the stay is lifted, the Government will be afforded a period of time to file its response to Docket No. 1. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 06/23/2017. (cvr) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Memorandum of the Clerk
Thu 06/22 5:19 PM
MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK. Pursuant to the Order Referring Motion entered by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 6/22/17 (Docket No. 2), the1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Camille Velez-Rive for report and recommendation. Signed by Clerk on 6/22/17.(gsr) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order Referring Motion
Thu 06/22 4:16 PM
ORDER REFERRING1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) as to Johnny Ayala-Garcia to a magistrate judge for a report and recommendation on the motion to correct sentence and to decide the motion to stay. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/22/2017. (brc) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Thu 06/22 2:26 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Pursuant to Johnson v. United States (Criminal Number 06-66) filed by Franco Lorenzo Perez-Redondo on behalf of Johnny Ayala-Garcia Responses due by 7/6/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Redondo, Franco) |