Rodriguez-Murphy et al v. United States of America
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Marcos E Lopez |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01841 |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Cause | 28:1346 Tort Claim |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 11, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 19, 2017 5:08 AM AST |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edwin Maysonet
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Giovanni Maysonet
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria I Maysonet
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Princi L Maysonet
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosa Rodriguez-Murphy
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 09 2019
OPINION AND ORDER granting 29 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 8/9/19. (YI) |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 11, 2019 | ||
62 | 62
order
Judgment
Wed 09/11 4:57 PM
JUDGMENT DISMISSING the complaint with prejudice. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 9/11/2019. (jjr) |
|
61 | 61
order
Order
Wed 09/11 4:46 PM
ORDER re60 Settlement Agreement filed by Maria I. Maysonet, Rosa Rodriguez-Murphy, Princi L. Maysonet, Giovanni Maysonet and Edwin Maysonet. Noted. Pursuant to the settlement agreement reached by the parties, the complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, fees and expenses. The trial is vacated. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 9/11/2019. (jjr) |
|
60 | 60
misc
Settlement Agreement
Wed 09/11 3:55 PM
Joint SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Edwin Maysonet, Giovanni Maysonet, Maria I. Maysonet, Princi L. Maysonet, Rosa Rodriguez-Murphy, United States of America. (Montaner-Cordero, Pablo) Modified on 9/12/2019 to edit title and add filer (mcm) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
59 | 59
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 09/10 2:34 PM
ORDER regarding58 Motion for extension of time: Granted. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 9/10/19. (jhi) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2019 | ||
58 | 58
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 09/09 9:17 PM
MOTION for extension of time until September 16, 17, 18 and 19 to comply with deadlines set in ECF No. 57 filed by Lisa E. Bhatia-Gautier on behalf of United States of America Responses due by 9/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bhatia-Gautier, Lisa) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
56 | 56
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 09/06 9:10 AM
ORDER granting55 Motion for extension of time. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 9/6/19. (jhi) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2019 | ||
55 | 55
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 09/04 12:30 PM
MOTION for extension of time filed by Lisa E. Bhatia-Gautier on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 9/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bhatia-Gautier, Lisa) |