Castro-Davis v. USA
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Carmen C Cerezo |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01842 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 20, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM AST |
Monday, May 20, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment
Wed 06/05 5:29 PM
JUDGMENT - DISMISSING this action, with prejudice. Related document:12 Copy of USCA Judgment. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 5/20/2019. (mld) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 04/05 5:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Felix Alberto Castro-Davis filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA Responses due by 4/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza, Mariana) |
|
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/05 2:27 PM
COPY of JUDGMENT of USCA as to Felix Alberto Castro-Davis (1) entered on 04/04/19; Petitioner seeks leave to file a second or successive 28 U.S.C. § 2255 motion featuring a challenge to one or more 18 U.S.C. § 924(c) convictions under Johnson v. United States, 135 S. Ct. 2551 (2015) (Johnson II), and related precedent. Accordingly, the application for leave to file a second or successive § 2255 motion is DENIED. Th[is]... denial of an authorization... to file a second or successive application shall not be appealable and shall not be the subject of a petition for rehearing or for a writ of certiorari. (xi) |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Informative Motion
Fri 12/14 4:52 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Case Status filed by Franco Lorenzo Perez-Redondo on behalf of Felix Alberto Castro-Davis Responses due by 12/28/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Redondo, Franco) |
|
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Informative Motion
Wed 10/17 1:16 PM
ORDER noted9 INFORMATIVE motion. Updated report on status due by 12/14/2018. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 10/16/18. (mcm) |
|
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Informative Motion
Wed 09/26 6:12 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Case Status filed by Franco Lorenzo Perez-Redondo on behalf of Felix Alberto Castro-Davis Responses due by 10/10/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Redondo, Franco) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 07/30 3:34 PM
ORDER noted7 Informative Motion. Petitioner's status report on application to First Circuit due by 9/26/2018 . Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 7/19/2018. (mld) |
|
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Informative Motion
Wed 04/25 7:33 AM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Case Status filed by Franco Lorenzo Perez-Redondo on behalf of Felix Alberto Castro-Davis Responses due by 5/9/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Redondo, Franco) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 04/09 1:22 PM
ORDER noted5 Motion in Compliance with4 Court Order. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 4/3/2018. (mld) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
In Compliance
Wed 02/28 4:49 PM
Motion In Compliance With Court Order at Docket Number 4 as to4 Order,, Set Deadlines,, Terminate Motions, filed by Franco Lorenzo Perez-Redondo on behalf of Felix Alberto Castro-Davis Responses due by 3/14/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Redondo, Franco) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 12/22 3:33 PM
ORDER as to3 Motion In Compliance with Court Order. The same is noted as to petitioner's compliance and granted as to the request for stay. Petitioner SHALL inform the Court on the status of the application to the First Circuit NO LATER THAN February 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 12/19/2017.(mr) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
In Compliance
Thu 11/30 12:46 PM
Motion In Compliance as to2 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, filed by Franco Lorenzo Perez-Redondo on behalf of Felix Alberto Castro-Davis Responses due by 12/14/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Redondo, Franco) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 10/17 1:05 PM
ORDER: The Motion to Stay Pending Authorization from Circuit included in Petitioner's1 Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence is GRANTED. Petitioner's informative motion due by 11/30/2017 . Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 9/14/2017. (mld) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Thu 06/22 4:20 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Pursuant to Johnson v. United States (Criminal Number 07-186) filed by Franco Lorenzo Perez-Redondo on behalf of Felix Alberto Castro-Davis Responses due by 7/6/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Redondo, Franco) |