Otero v. USA
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Aida M Delgado-Colon |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01845 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 27, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment
Fri 04/12 4:34 PM
JUDGMENT. The Section 2255 petition is HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Clerk on 4/12/2019.(sr) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order
Fri 04/12 4:06 PM
ORDER. In light of the First Circuit Court of Appeals denial of petitioner Jos A. Oteros request to file a second or successive § 2255 motion, see ECF No. 4, the petition at ECF No. 1 is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/11/2019.(wm) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
order
Memorandum of the Clerk
Mon 04/08 4:12 PM
MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: This case is hereby reassigned to the docket of Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon, who presides over related Case Number 96-cr-116-02 (ADC). Signed by Clerk on 04/08/2019. (ft) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/08 3:31 PM
COPY of JUDGMENT of USCA as to Jose A. Otero (2) entered on 04/05/19; Petitioner seeks leave to file a second or successive 28 U.S.C. § 2255 motion featuring a challenge to one or more 18 U.S.C. § 924(c) convictions under Johnson v. United States, 135 S. Ct. 2551 (2015) (Johnson II), and related precedent. Accordingly, the application for leave to file a second or successive § 2255 motion is DENIED. Th[is]... denial of an authorization... to file a second or successive application shall not be appealable and shall not be the subject of a petition for rehearing or for a writ of certiorari. (xi) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Judgment
Fri 10/27 12:49 PM
JUDGMENT STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Salvador E. Casellas on 10/27/17.(su) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order
Fri 10/27 12:49 PM
ORDER - Pursuant to the Standing Order at Misc. Case No. 16-196, this case is hereby STAYED while the Office of the Federal Public Defender evaluates Petitioner's motion. Signed by Judge Salvador E. Casellas on 10/27/17.(su) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Thu 06/22 5:02 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) and Motion to Stay Proceedings (Criminal Number 96-116 (SEC)) filed by Eleonora C. Marranzini on behalf of Jose A. Otero Responses due by 7/6/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marranzini, Eleonora) |