Longo Flores v. Voya Institutional Trust Company
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Francisco A Besosa |
Referred: | Judith G Dein |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01846 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 03, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 19, 2017 4:54 AM AST |
Defendant
Voya Institutional Trust Company
P.O. Box 70294
San Juan, PR 00936 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Annabel Longo-Flores
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago |
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
order
Judgment
Fri 05/03 1:39 PM
JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 5/3/2019.(ab) |
|
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Judgment
Fri 05/03 10:48 AM
ORDER re24 Motion for Judgment: GRANTED. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. The request to retain jurisdiction is denied. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 5/3/2019. (ab) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Judgment
Thu 05/02 7:26 PM
MOTION for Judgment filed by Sergio Sanchez-Pagan on behalf of Annabel Longo-Flores Responses due by 5/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Pagan, Sergio) |
|
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Status Report
Fri 08/10 5:56 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Voya Institutional Trust Company. (Stipec-Rubio, Katarina) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 08/01 8:23 AM
ORDER setting deadline for joint status report. Status Report due by 8/10/2018. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein on 7/31/2018.(grf) |
|
21 | 21
order
Memorandum of the Clerk
Tue 07/31 1:55 PM
MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Francisco A. Besosa (Docket No. 20), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Judith Dein for all pretrial matters. Signed by Clerk on 07/31/2018. (ft) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/31 1:20 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith Dein for all pretrial matters. The Case Management Order (Docket No.12 ) is vacated. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 7/31/2018.(grf) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Memorandum of the Clerk
Mon 07/30 3:27 PM
MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By18 Order of Judge Laura Taylor Swain, this case is transferred to the docket of Judge Francisco A. Besosa, who has consented to said transfer. Signed by Clerk on 07/30/2018. (gr) |
|
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/30 3:05 PM
ORDER transferring case to Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 07/30/2018.(ct) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Tue 11/14 4:57 PM
ORDER: Having considered "VIT's Motion to Transfer Case"14 and plaintiff's "Response to Defendant's Motion to Transfer the Case"16 , the motion to transfer is granted. This action is transferred to Bankruptcy Case No. 17-bk-03283(LTS). Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez(LMR) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 11/06 9:19 PM
RESPONSE to Motion to transfer case filed by Annabel Longo-Flores Re:14 MOTION to transfer case filed by Voya Institutional Trust Company filed by Annabel Longo-Flores. (Sanchez-Pagan, Sergio) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Informative Motion
Fri 10/27 11:43 AM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding VITC's Motion to Transfer filed by Sergio Sanchez-Pagan on behalf of Annabel Longo-Flores Responses due by 11/13/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Pagan, Sergio) |
|
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Transfer Case
Mon 10/09 3:40 PM
MOTION to transfer case filed by Katarina Stipec-Rubio on behalf of Voya Institutional Trust Company Responses due by 10/19/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Stipec-Rubio, Katarina) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/09 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katarina Stipec-Rubio on behalf of Voya Institutional Trust Company (Stipec-Rubio, Katarina) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order - Case Management Order
Wed 09/13 9:39 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Deadline to amend the pleadings and to add parties: October 20, 2017. Motions to Dismiss/Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings: October 31, 2017. Conclusion of discovery (factual and expert): January 31, 2018. Deadline to file motion(s) for summary judgment: March 2, 2018. Deadline to file opposition(s) to summary judgment: April 2, 2018. See instructions attached pertaining to documents not in the English language and courtesy copies. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/13/2017.(LMR) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
In Compliance
Mon 09/11 8:41 PM
Joint Motion In Compliance to submit Proposed Schedule filed by Sergio Sanchez-Pagan on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/25/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanchez-Pagan, Sergio) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 08/29 4:33 PM
ORDER: See attached. Joint Proposed Schedule due by 9/11/2017. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/29/2017.(LMR) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 08/29 3:02 PM
Voya Institutional Trust Company's ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Pedro Jimenez-Rodriguez on behalf of Defendant Voya Institutional Trust Company.(Jimenez-Rodriguez, Pedro) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Informative Motion
Fri 07/14 12:02 PM
ORDER: Noting7 "Informative Motion." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/14/2017. (LMR) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Informative Motion
Thu 07/13 5:00 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Waiver of Service of Summons filed by Sergio Sanchez-Pagan on behalf of Annabel Longo-Flores Responses due by 7/27/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Sanchez-Pagan, Sergio) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/23 11:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Voya Institutional Trust Company (bgl) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Filing Exhibits
Fri 06/23 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons (Sanchez-Pagan, Sergio) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Fri 06/23 9:52 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/22 6:35 PM
COMPLAINT 's Category Sheet against Voya Institutional Trust Company, filed by Annabel Longo Flores. Service due by 9/20/2017,(Sanchez-Pagan, Sergio) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/22 6:26 PM
COMPLAINT Category Sheet against Voya Institutional Trust Company, filed by Annabel Longo Flores. Service due by 9/20/2017,(Sanchez-Pagan, Sergio) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/22 5:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Voya Institutional Trust Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5498001.), filed by Annabel Longo Flores. Service due by 9/20/2017,(Sanchez-Pagan, Sergio) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 |