DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. v. Conde-Vidal
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Gustavo A Gelpi |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01853 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 19, 2017 4:38 AM AST |
Defendant
Iliana Lourdes Conde-Vidal
200 ParkWest #97
Bayamon, PR 00961 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.
11 Madison Ave. 4th Floor
New York, NY 10010 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment
Mon 01/28 4:44 PM
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the courts order (Docket No. 13), judgment is hereby entered staying the instant case pending bankruptcy proceedings. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/28/2019. (AGF) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 01/28 4:38 PM
ORDER: Granting12 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/28/2019. (AGF) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Stay
Mon 01/28 10:38 AM
MOTION to Stay of Proceedings pursuant 11 U.S.C. §362 re: 10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Ada M. Conde-Vidal on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 2/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Conde-Vidal, Ada) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Order of Stay Bank case 18-1154 | ||
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Memorandum of the Clerk
Thu 01/24 5:34 PM
MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi, this case has been randomly reassigned to his docket. Signed by Clerk on 1/24/2019. (nat) |
|
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 05/10 3:25 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer deadline due by 5/30/2018. Signed by Judge William G Young on 5/30/2018. (EES) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 11/27 6:04 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or file dispositive motion until 2/28/2018 re: 8 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, 6 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,1 Complaint, filed by DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. filed by Ada M. Conde-Vidal on behalf of Iliana Lourdes Conde-Vidal Responses due by 12/11/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Conde-Vidal, Ada) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 09/21 2:11 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re7 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until November 3, 2017 to File Answer to allow loss mitigation process to complete due to situations with Hurricanes Irma and Maria re: 6 Order on Motion for Extension of Time filed by Iliana Lourdes Conde-Vidal Answer deadline due by 11/3/2017. Signed by Judge William G Young on 9/21/2017. (EES) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 09/19 8:16 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time until November 3, 2017 to File Answer to allow loss mitigation process to complete due to situations with Hurricanes Irma and Maria re: 6 Order on Motion for Extension of Time filed by Ada M. Conde-Vidal on behalf of Iliana Lourdes Conde-Vidal Responses due by 10/3/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Conde-Vidal, Ada) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 07/28 10:07 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for extension of time Answer deadline due by 9/8/2017. Signed by Judge William G Young on 7/28/2017. (EES) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/26 6:42 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants, SUMMONS Returned Executed 07/07/2017 by All Plaintiffs upon All Defendants. (Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 07/26 9:11 AM
MOTION for extension of time until 9/8/2017 to file answer to complaint and/or file dispositive motion filed by Ada M. Conde-Vidal on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 8/9/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Conde-Vidal, Ada) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/23 11:14 AM
Summons Issued as to Iliana Lourdes Conde-Vidal (arg) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Fri 06/23 10:08 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G Young (arg) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/22 7:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Iliana Lourdes Conde-Vidal ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5498275.), filed by DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.. Service due by 9/20/2017,(Colon-Villanueva, Marjaliisa) |
|
Att: 1 Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit MORTGAGE NOTE, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit MORTGAGE DEED, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit MORTGAGE MODIFICATION DEED, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit TITLE SEARCH, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit SCRA |