JOHNSON v. MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | James E Boasberg |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01223 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 20, 2017 3:38 AM EST |
Defendant
MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SANDRA JOHNSON
E R HAMILTON 6009 MEMORIAL DR
HOUSTON, TX 77007 |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Tue 08/15 10:16 AM
MINUTE ORDER: As Plaintiff has failed to respond to the Court's Order of July 26, 2017, the Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/15/2017. (lcjeb3) |
||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Appear Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/26 8:17 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sarah L. Bunce, :Firm- Tucker Ellis LLP, :Address- 950 Main Avenue, Suite 1100. Phone No. - 216.696.4094. Fax No. - 216.592.5009 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5047560. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC(Cumby, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/26 8:06 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Dustin B. Rawlin, :Firm- Tucker Ellis LLP, :Address- 950 Main Avenue, Suite 1100. Phone No. - 216.696.42335. Fax No. - 216.592.5009 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5047558. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC(Cumby, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Dustin B. Rawlin, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/26 9:53 AM
MINUTE ORDER GRANTING18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of DUSTIN B. RAWLIN. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/26/2017. (lcjeb3) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/26 10:01 AM
MINUTE ORDER GRANTING19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of SARAH L. BUNCE. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/26/2017. (lcjeb3) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 07/26 12:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's status conference, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiff's Counsels'11 14 Motions to Withdraw are GRANTED; and 2) Plaintiff shall show cause by August 14, 2017, why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/26/2017. (lcjeb3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 07/26 2:14 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 8/14/2017. (nbn) |
||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 07/27 12:48 PM
Minute Entry for Initial Scheduling Conference held before Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/26/17 : The Court will rule on the motion by Plaintiff's counsel to withdraw. (Court Reporter: Lisa Griffith) (kk) |
||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/25 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Counts Cumby on behalf of MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC (Cumby, Joshua) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/26 9:29 AM
MINUTE ORDER: An Initial Scheduling Conference is set for July 26, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. before Judge James E. Boasberg in Courtroom 19. The parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report pursuant to FRCP 26(f) and Local Rule 16.3. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/26/2017. (lcjeb3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 06/26 10:18 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/26/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn) |
||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 06/23 10:01 AM
Case transferred in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 4:16-cv-00046. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (td). |
|
Att: 2 (6/23/2017) Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15 MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring proceedings District of the District of Columbia for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings and VACATING 13 Order granting motion to withdraw. Copy forwarded via email to the Joint Panel on Multi-District Litigation on even date herewith (tlf). [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/23/2017.] | |
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by SANDRA JOHNSON filed by E R HAMILTON.(HAMILTON, E) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/23/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Ltr to Client, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
13 | 13 ORDER granting11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney MICAJAH D BOATRIGHT; JASON A ITKIN; J STEVE MOSTYN; LAURA STEHR PETERS; NOAH M WEXLER; REBECCA L ADAMS and KURT B ARNOLD terminated Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 6/9/2017 (esl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/23/2017.] | |
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by E R HAMILTON on behalf of SANDRA JOHNSON Attorney E R HAMILTON added to party SANDRA JOHNSON(pty:pla) (HAMILTON, E) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/23/2017.] | |
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
11 | 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by SANDRA JOHNSON filed by NOAH M WEXLER.(WEXLER, NOAH) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/23/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Ltr to Client, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LAURA STEHR PETERS on behalf of SANDRA JOHNSON Attorney LAURA STEHR PETERS added to party SANDRA JOHNSON(pty:pla) (PETERS, LAURA) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/23/2017.] | |
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by REBECCA L ADAMS on behalf of SANDRA JOHNSON Attorney REBECCA L ADAMS added to party SANDRA JOHNSON(pty:pla) (ADAMS, REBECCA) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/23/2017.] | |
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 03/14/17. Associated Cases: ALL (CCL) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/23/2017.] | |
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER granting Motion to be relieved of duties as Plaintiffs' co-lead counsel (ECF No. 1070 in 4:08-md-2004). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/09/2016. (CCL) Associated Cases: ALL [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/23/2017.] | |
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
6 | 6 MOTION To Be Relieved of duty by ALL PLAINTIFFS filed by Mark A DiCello.Associated Cases: 4:08-md-02004-CDL, 4:13-cv-00321-CDL, 4:13-cv-00335-CDL, 4:13-cv-00388-CDL, 4:13-cv-00505-CDL, 4:14-cv-00012-CDL, 4:14-cv-00026-CDL, 4:14-cv-00053-CDL, 4:14-cv-00054-CDL, 4:14-cv-00078-CDL, 4:14-cv-00099-CDL, 4:14-cv-00105-CDL, 4:14-cv-00113-CDL, 4:14-cv-00118-CDL, 4:14-cv-00130-CDL, 4:14-cv-00156-CDL, 4:14-cv-00161-CDL, 4:14-cv-00171-CDL, 4:14-cv-00172-CDL, 4:14-cv-00175-CDL, 4:14-cv-00176-CDL, 4:14-cv-00177-CDL, 4:14-cv-00178-CDL, 4:14-cv-00179-CDL, 4:14-cv-00180-CDL, 4:14-cv-00186-CDL, 4:14-cv-00189-CDL, 4:14-cv-00190-CDL, 4:14-cv-00191-CDL, 4:14-cv-00196-CDL, 4:14-cv-00200-CDL, 4:14-cv-00201-CDL, 4:14-cv-00202-CDL, 4:14-cv-00207-CDL, 4:14-cv-00211-CDL, 4:14-cv-00212-CDL, 4:14-cv-00213-CDL, 4:14-cv-00216-CDL, 4:14-cv-00217-CDL, 4:14-cv-00218-CDL, 4:14-cv-00233-CDL, 4:14-cv-00240-CDL, 4:14-cv-00259-CDL, 4:14-cv-00282-CDL, 4:14-cv-00284-CDL, 4:14-cv-00286-CDL, 4:14-cv-00287-CDL, 4:14-cv-00288-CDL, 4:14-cv-00293-CDL, 4:14-cv-00294-CDL, 4:14-cv-00295-CDL, 4:14-cv-00296-CDL, 4:14-cv-00297-CDL, 4:14-cv-00298-CDL, 4:14-cv-00299-CDL, 4:14-cv-00302-CDL, 4:15-cv-00023-CDL, 4:15-cv-00043-CDL, 4:15-cv-00048-CDL, 4:15-cv-00073-CDL, 4:15-cv-00076-CDL, 4:15-cv-00078-CDL, 4:15-cv-00084-CDL, 4:15-cv-00086-CDL, 4:15-cv-00091-CDL, 4:15-cv-00099-CDL, 4:15-cv-00100-CDL, 4:15-cv-00102-CDL, 4:15-cv-00106-CDL, 4:15-cv-00114-CDL, 4:15-cv-00115-CDL, 4:15-cv-00122-CDL, 4:15-cv-00126-CDL, 4:15-cv-00131-CDL, 4:15-cv-00136-CDL, 4:15-cv-00140-CDL, 4:15-cv-00141-CDL, 4:15-cv-00146-CDL, 4:15-cv-00153-CDL, 4:15-cv-00154-CDL, 4:15-cv-00169-CDL, 4:15-cv-00171-CDL, 4:15-cv-00175-CDL, 4:15-cv-00176-CDL, 4:15-cv-00177-CDL, 4:15-cv-00178-CDL, 4:16-cv-00035-CDL, 4:16-cv-00038-CDL, 4:16-cv-00039-CDL, 4:16-cv-00040-CDL, 4:16-cv-00041-CDL, 4:16-cv-00042-CDL, 4:16-cv-00043-CDL, 4:16-cv-00044-CDL, 4:16-cv-00046-CDL, 4:16-cv-00047-CDL, 4:16-cv-00048-CDL, 4:16-cv-00049-CDL, 4:16-cv-00050-CDL, 4:16-cv-00051-CDL, 4:16-cv-00052-CDL, 4:16-cv-00053-CDL, 4:16-cv-00054-CDL, 4:16-cv-00055-CDL, 4:16-cv-00056-CDL, 4:16-cv-00057-CDL, 4:16-cv-00058-CDL, 4:16-cv-00059-CDL, 4:16-cv-00060-CDL, 4:16-cv-00061-CDL, 4:16-cv-00062-CDL, 4:16-cv-00065-CDL, 4:16-cv-00066-CDL, 4:16-cv-00067-CDL, 4:16-cv-00068-CDL, 4:16-cv-00085-CDL, 4:16-cv-00088-CDL, 4:16-cv-00089-CDL, 4:16-cv-00090-CDL, 4:16-cv-00091-CDL, 4:16-cv-00092-CDL, 4:16-cv-00093-CDL, 4:16-cv-00095-CDL, 4:16-cv-00162-CDL, 4:16-cv-00230-CDL, 4:16-cv-00251-CDL, 4:16-cv-00287-CDL, 4:16-cv-00288-CDL, 4:16-cv-00289-CDL, 4:16-cv-00314-CDL, 4:16-cv-00315-CDL, 4:16-cv-00316-CDL, 4:16-cv-00335-CDL, 4:16-cv-00348-CDL, 4:16-cv-00349-CDL, 4:16-cv-00350-CDL, 4:16-cv-00351-CDL, 4:16-cv-00352-CDL(DiCello, Mark) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/23/2017.] | |
Wednesday, September 07, 2016 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 09/07/2016. Associated Cases: ALL. (CCL) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/23/2017.] | |
Tuesday, April 26, 2016 | ||
4 | 4 ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC.(LEWIS, JOHN)Attorney JOHN Q LEWIS added to party MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC(pty:dft) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/23/2017.] | |
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
3 | 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SANDRA JOHNSON. as to MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC (ARNOLD, KURT) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/23/2017.] | |
Monday, March 14, 2016 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Phase IV-Group 6 Cases by MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC Associated Cases: 4:08-md-02004-CDL, 4:12-cv-00086-CDL, 4:12-cv-00133-CDL, 4:12-cv-00299-CDL, 4:12-cv-00303-CDL, 4:13-cv-00027-CDL, 4:13-cv-00100-CDL, 4:13-cv-00125-CDL, 4:13-cv-00127-CDL, 4:13-cv-00130-CDL, 4:13-cv-00131-CDL, 4:13-cv-00132-CDL, 4:13-cv-00135-CDL, 4:13-cv-00144-CDL, 4:13-cv-00221-CDL, 4:13-cv-00224-CDL, 4:13-cv-00227-CDL, 4:13-cv-00228-CDL, 4:13-cv-00229-CDL, 4:13-cv-00232-CDL, 4:13-cv-00238-CDL, 4:13-cv-00239-CDL, 4:13-cv-00242-CDL, 4:13-cv-00243-CDL, 4:13-cv-00244-CDL, 4:13-cv-00245-CDL, 4:13-cv-00246-CDL, 4:13-cv-00247-CDL, 4:13-cv-00264-CDL, 4:13-cv-00269-CDL, 4:13-cv-00277-CDL, 4:13-cv-00279-CDL, 4:13-cv-00280-CDL, 4:13-cv-00281-CDL, 4:13-cv-00283-CDL, 4:13-cv-00284-CDL, 4:13-cv-00285-CDL, 4:13-cv-00286-CDL, 4:13-cv-00287-CDL, 4:13-cv-00288-CDL, 4:13-cv-00289-CDL, 4:13-cv-00290-CDL, 4:13-cv-00291-CDL, 4:13-cv-00292-CDL, 4:13-cv-00293-CDL, 4:13-cv-00294-CDL, 4:13-cv-00295-CDL, 4:13-cv-00297-CDL, 4:13-cv-00298-CDL, 4:13-cv-00299-CDL, 4:13-cv-00300-CDL, 4:13-cv-00301-CDL, 4:13-cv-00302-CDL, 4:13-cv-00303-CDL, 4:13-cv-00309-CDL, 4:13-cv-00311-CDL, 4:13-cv-00313-CDL, 4:13-cv-00314-CDL, 4:13-cv-00320-CDL, 4:13-cv-00321-CDL, 4:13-cv-00322-CDL, 4:13-cv-00323-CDL, 4:13-cv-00329-CDL, 4:13-cv-00333-CDL, 4:13-cv-00335-CDL, 4:13-cv-00337-CDL, 4:13-cv-00342-CDL, 4:13-cv-00345-CDL, 4:13-cv-00348-CDL, 4:13-cv-00349-CDL, 4:13-cv-00353-CDL, 4:13-cv-00355-CDL, 4:13-cv-00356-CDL, 4:13-cv-00357-CDL, 4:13-cv-00359-CDL, 4:13-cv-00364-CDL, 4:13-cv-00365-CDL, 4:13-cv-00368-CDL, 4:13-cv-00370-CDL, 4:13-cv-00371-CDL, 4:13-cv-00373-CDL, 4:13-cv-00375-CDL, 4:13-cv-00376-CDL, 4:13-cv-00378-CDL, 4:13-cv-00384-CDL, 4:13-cv-00388-CDL, 4:13-cv-00392-CDL, 4:13-cv-00393-CDL, 4:13-cv-00394-CDL, 4:13-cv-00395-CDL, 4:13-cv-00396-CDL, 4:13-cv-00397-CDL, 4:13-cv-00400-CDL, 4:13-cv-00414-CDL, 4:13-cv-00419-CDL, 4:13-cv-00425-CDL, 4:13-cv-00429-CDL, 4:13-cv-00432-CDL, 4:13-cv-00437-CDL, 4:13-cv-00438-CDL, 4:13-cv-00447-CDL, 4:13-cv-00448-CDL, 4:13-cv-00450-CDL, 4:13-cv-00462-CDL, 4:13-cv-00465-CDL, 4:13-cv-00466-CDL, 4:13-cv-00473-CDL, 4:13-cv-00476-CDL, 4:13-cv-00478-CDL, 4:13-cv-00479-CDL, 4:13-cv-00484-CDL, 4:13-cv-00490-CDL, 4:13-cv-00499-CDL, 4:13-cv-00502-CDL, 4:13-cv-00504-CDL, 4:13-cv-00505-CDL, 4:13-cv-00507-CDL, 4:13-cv-00508-CDL, 4:13-cv-00509-CDL, 4:13-cv-00512-CDL, 4:13-cv-00514-CDL, 4:13-cv-00515-CDL, 4:13-cv-00516-CDL, 4:13-cv-00517-CDL, 4:13-cv-00518-CDL, 4:13-cv-00524-CDL, 4:13-cv-00526-CDL, 4:13-cv-00527-CDL, 4:13-cv-00530-CDL, 4:13-cv-00533-CDL, 4:14-cv-00005-CDL, 4:14-cv-00006-CDL, 4:14-cv-00007-CDL, 4:14-cv-00008-CDL, 4:14-cv-00012-CDL, 4:14-cv-00013-CDL, 4:14-cv-00014-CDL, 4:14-cv-00015-CDL, 4:14-cv-00017-CDL, 4:14-cv-00021-CDL, 4:14-cv-00022-CDL, 4:14-cv-00023-CDL, 4:14-cv-00026-CDL, 4:14-cv-00031-CDL, 4:14-cv-00038-CDL, 4:14-cv-00053-CDL, 4:14-cv-00054-CDL, 4:14-cv-00055-CDL, 4:14-cv-00056-CDL, 4:14-cv-00073-CDL, 4:14-cv-00078-CDL, 4:14-cv-00088-CDL, 4:14-cv-00095-CDL, 4:14-cv-00098-CDL, 4:14-cv-00099-CDL, 4:14-cv-00104-CDL, 4:14-cv-00105-CDL, 4:14-cv-00106-CDL, 4:14-cv-00107-CDL, 4:14-cv-00108-CDL, 4:14-cv-00113-CDL, 4:14-cv-00114-CDL, 4:14-cv-00117-CDL, 4:14-cv-00118-CDL, 4:14-cv-00124-CDL, 4:14-cv-00129-CDL, 4:14-cv-00130-CDL, 4:14-cv-00133-CDL, 4:14-cv-00147-CDL, 4:14-cv-00150-CDL, 4:14-cv-00152-CDL, 4:14-cv-00155-CDL, 4:14-cv-00156-CDL, 4:14-cv-00157-CDL, 4:14-cv-00158-CDL, 4:14-cv-00159-CDL, 4:14-cv-00160-CDL, 4:14-cv-00161-CDL, 4:14-cv-00162-CDL, 4:14-cv-00165-CDL, 4:14-cv-00169-CDL, 4:14-cv-00170-CDL, 4:14-cv-00171-CDL, 4:14-cv-00172-CDL, 4:14-cv-00173-CDL, 4:14-cv-00175-CDL, 4:14-cv-00176-CDL, 4:14-cv-00177-CDL, 4:14-cv-00178-CDL, 4:14-cv-00179-CDL, 4:14-cv-00180-CDL, 4:14-cv-00181-CDL, 4:14-cv-00182-CDL, 4:14-cv-00185-CDL, 4:14-cv-00186-CDL, 4:14-cv-00189-CDL, 4:14-cv-00190-CDL, 4:14-cv-00191-CDL, 4:14-cv-00195-CDL, 4:14-cv-00196-CDL, 4:14-cv-00197-CDL, 4:14-cv-00199-CDL, 4:14-cv-00200-CDL, 4:14-cv-00201-CDL, 4:14-cv-00202-CDL, 4:14-cv-00206-CDL, 4:14-cv-00207-CDL, 4:14-cv-00209-CDL, 4:14-cv-00211-CDL, 4:14-cv-00212-CDL, 4:14-cv-00213-CDL, 4:14-cv-00214-CDL, 4:14-cv-00215-CDL, 4:14-cv-00216-CDL, 4:14-cv-00217-CDL, 4:14-cv-00218-CDL, 4:14-cv-00233-CDL, 4:14-cv-00238-CDL, 4:14-cv-00240-CDL, 4:14-cv-00258-CDL, 4:14-cv-00259-CDL, 4:14-cv-00268-CDL, 4:14-cv-00269-CDL, 4:14-cv-00282-CDL, 4:14-cv-00284-CDL, 4:14-cv-00286-CDL, 4:14-cv-00287-CDL, 4:14-cv-00288-CDL, 4:14-cv-00293-CDL, 4:14-cv-00294-CDL, 4:14-cv-00295-CDL, 4:14-cv-00296-CDL, 4:14-cv-00297-CDL, 4:14-cv-00298-CDL, 4:14-cv-00299-CDL, 4:14-cv-00302-CDL, 4:15-cv-00023-CDL, 4:15-cv-00043-CDL, 4:15-cv-00045-CDL, 4:15-cv-00048-CDL, 4:15-cv-00049-CDL, 4:15-cv-00071-CDL, 4:15-cv-00073-CDL, 4:15-cv-00076-CDL, 4:15-cv-00078-CDL, 4:15-cv-00083-CDL, 4:15-cv-00084-CDL, 4:15-cv-00085-CDL, 4:15-cv-00086-CDL, 4:15-cv-00091-CDL, 4:15-cv-00099-CDL, 4:15-cv-00100-CDL, 4:15-cv-00102-CDL, 4:15-cv-00106-CDL, 4:15-cv-00114-CDL, 4:15-cv-00115-CDL, 4:15-cv-00122-CDL, 4:15-cv-00126-CDL, 4:15-cv-00130-CDL, 4:15-cv-00131-CDL, 4:15-cv-00136-CDL, 4:15-cv-00140-CDL, 4:15-cv-00141-CDL, 4:15-cv-00146-CDL, 4:15-cv-00153-CDL, 4:15-cv-00154-CDL, 4:15-cv-00169-CDL, 4:15-cv-00171-CDL, 4:15-cv-00175-CDL, 4:15-cv-00176-CDL, 4:15-cv-00177-CDL, 4:15-cv-00178-CDL, 4:16-cv-00035-CDL, 4:16-cv-00036-CDL, 4:16-cv-00037-CDL, 4:16-cv-00038-CDL, 4:16-cv-00039-CDL, 4:16-cv-00040-CDL, 4:16-cv-00041-CDL, 4:16-cv-00042-CDL, 4:16-cv-00043-CDL, 4:16-cv-00044-CDL, 4:16-cv-00046-CDL, 4:16-cv-00047-CDL, 4:16-cv-00048-CDL, 4:16-cv-00049-CDL, 4:16-cv-00050-CDL, 4:16-cv-00051-CDL, 4:16-cv-00052-CDL, 4:16-cv-00053-CDL, 4:16-cv-00054-CDL, 4:16-cv-00055-CDL, 4:16-cv-00056-CDL, 4:16-cv-00057-CDL, 4:16-cv-00058-CDL, 4:16-cv-00059-CDL, 4:16-cv-00060-CDL, 4:16-cv-00061-CDL, 4:16-cv-00062-CDL, 4:16-cv-00063-CDL, 4:16-cv-00064-CDL, 4:16-cv-00065-CDL, 4:16-cv-00066-CDL, 4:16-cv-00067-CDL, 4:16-cv-00068-CDL, 4:16-cv-00069-CDL, 4:16-cv-00085-CDL(LEWIS, JOHN) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/23/2017.] | |
Wednesday, February 24, 2016 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT filed by SANDRA JOHNSON against MENTOR WORLDWIDE, LLC. Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 113G-2272069(tlf). [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/23/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |