ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT et al v. PRUITT
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Richard J Leon |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01233 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | 42:7604 Clear Air Act (Emission Standards) |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 20, 2017 4:17 AM EST |
Defendant
SCOTT PRUITT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHESAPEAKE CLIMATE ACTION NETWORK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PHYSICIANS FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY, CHESAPEAKE, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
order
Order Lifting Stay
Fri 07/20 8:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of31 Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in the above-captioned case is LIFTED. It is further ORDERED that the pending cross-motions for summary judgment (ECF Nos. 10 & 14) are DENIED AS MOOT. It is further ORDERED that the above-captioned case be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to terminate the above-captioned case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/20/2018. (lcrjl1) |
||
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 07/17 2:07 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by CHESAPEAKE CLIMATE ACTION NETWORK, ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, PHYSICIANS FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY, CHESAPEAKE, INC.. (Kron, Adam) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
order
.Order
Fri 07/13 10:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of29 Status Report Providing Notice of Payment for Costs of Litigation and Dismissal of Case with Prejudice, it is hereby ORDERED that, in order to effectuate the voluntary dismissal of the above-captioned action, the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/13/2018. (lcrjl1) |
||
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 07/12 6:00 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CHESAPEAKE CLIMATE ACTION NETWORK, ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, PHYSICIANS FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY, CHESAPEAKE, INC. (Kron, Adam) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Status Report
Thu 07/12 5:57 PM
STATUS REPORT by CHESAPEAKE CLIMATE ACTION NETWORK, ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, PHYSICIANS FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY, CHESAPEAKE, INC.. (Kron, Adam) |
|
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 04/13 12:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting27 Joint Motion to Extend Stay. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report and Motion to Extend Stay27 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that proceedings in this case are STAYED until August 2, 2018, subject to plaintiffs' ability to move to lift the stay and petition the court for relief if the parties are unable to resolve plaintiffs' claim for costs of litigation. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before August 2, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/13/2018. (lcrjl1) |
||
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Status Report
Wed 04/04 12:00 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by SCOTT PRUITT. (Chen, Sue) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Stay
Wed 04/04 11:59 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay proceedings by SCOTT PRUITT(Chen, Sue) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 02/21 9:14 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting26 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that all proceedings in the above-captioned case are STAYED until April 4, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report regarding their progress in resolving plaintiffs' claim for costs of litigation and attorney fees on or before April 4, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/21/2018. (lcrjl1) |
||
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Stay
Fri 02/16 1:36 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay proceedings by SCOTT PRUITT(Chen, Sue) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Status Report
Fri 02/02 10:59 AM
STATUS REPORT by SCOTT PRUITT. (Chen, Sue) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 01/19 5:21 PM
NOTICE of subsequent event by SCOTT PRUITT (Chen, Sue) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Affidavit
Tue 10/31 12:51 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION re14 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment ,13 Response to motion by SCOTT PRUITT. (znmw) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 10/30 1:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting22 EPA's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The clerk is directed to file the 10/23/2017 supplemental declaration of Anna Marie Wood, Director, Air Quality Policy Division, Environmental Protection Agency (ECF Doc. No. 22-1). Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/30/2017. (lcrjl1) |
||
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 10/26 5:16 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File supplemental declaration by SCOTT PRUITT(Chen, Sue) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration supplemental declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Meet and Confer Statement
Thu 10/19 10:41 AM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT.(Kron, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order | ||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Fri 09/22 10:17 AM
REPLY to opposition to motion re14 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SCOTT PRUITT. (Chen, Sue) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Affidavit
Mon 09/18 3:49 PM
DECLARATION Amended re14 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment ,13 Response to motion by SCOTT PRUITT. (znmw) |
|
18 | 18
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Fri 09/15 5:46 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CHESAPEAKE CLIMATE ACTION NETWORK, ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, PHYSICIANS FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY, CHESAPEAKE, INC..(Kron, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17
9
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Fri 09/15 5:40 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re14 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CHESAPEAKE CLIMATE ACTION NETWORK, ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, PHYSICIANS FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY, CHESAPEAKE, INC..(Kron, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Facts, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Fri 09/15 4:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting16 EPA's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Declaration. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The clerk is directed to file the 09/13/2017 amended declaration of Anna Marie Wood, Director, Air Quality Policy Division, Environmental Protection Agency (ECF Doc. No. 16-1). Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 09/15/2017. (lcrjl1) |
||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 09/13 4:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File amended declaration by SCOTT PRUITT(Chen, Sue) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/08 12:15 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by SCOTT PRUITT.(Chen, Sue) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 09/08 12:14 PM
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by SCOTT PRUITT(Chen, Sue) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Statement of Facts, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response to motion
Fri 09/08 12:11 PM
RESPONSE re10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SCOTT PRUITT.(Chen, Sue) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Statement of Facts, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 08/09 4:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting12 defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadlines to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment and Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that defendant's response to the motion for summary judgment and response to the complaint shall both be filed on or before September 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 08/09/2017. (lcrjl1) |
||
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to
Tue 08/08 3:51 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file response and answer by SCOTT PRUITT (Chen, Sue) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/04 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sue Chen on behalf of SCOTT PRUITT (Chen, Sue) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 07/27 3:09 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by CHESAPEAKE CLIMATE ACTION NETWORK, ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, PHYSICIANS FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY, CHESAPEAKE, INC.(Kron, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 3 Statement of Facts, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration, | ||
Att: 7 Declaration, | ||
Att: 8 Declaration, | ||
Att: 9 Declaration, | ||
Att: 10 Declaration, | ||
Att: 11 Declaration | ||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Wed 07/26 6:24 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SCOTT PRUITT served on 7/3/2017(Kron, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Wed 07/26 6:20 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/3/2017.(Kron, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Wed 07/26 6:18 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/3/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/1/2017.(Kron, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Standing Order
Wed 06/28 2:52 PM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 06/28/17. (lcrjl1) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Mon 06/26 4:34 PM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SCOTT PRUITT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Forms)(jd) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/23 1:30 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHESAPEAKE CLIMATE ACTION NETWORK, ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, PHYSICIANS FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY, CHESAPEAKE, INC.. (Kron, Adam) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/23 1:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHESAPEAKE CLIMATE ACTION NETWORK, ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, PHYSICIANS FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY, CHESAPEAKE, INC.. (Kron, Adam) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/23 1:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHESAPEAKE CLIMATE ACTION NETWORK, ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, PHYSICIANS FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY, CHESAPEAKE, INC.. (Kron, Adam) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/23 1:15 PM
COMPLAINT against SCOTT PRUITT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5004088) filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, PHYSICIANS FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY, CHESAPEAKE, INC., CHESAPEAKE CLIMATE ACTION NETWORK.(Kron, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Petition to Object, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Intent to Sue, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Summons EPA, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Summons AG, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Summons US AO | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/26 4:31 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (jd) |