RUSH UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER v. PRICE
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Colleen Kollar-Kotelly |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01234 |
Nature of Suit | 151 Contract - Medicare Act |
Cause | 42:1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 20, 2017 4:02 AM EST |
Defendant
THOMAS E. PRICE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RUSH UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
.Order
Wed 10/10 4:28 PM
ORDER. The Court shall hereby REMAND this matter to the Defendant for further proceedings consistent with the Saint Francis decision and DISMISS this matter WITHOUT PREJUDICE. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 10, 2018. (lcckk1) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Mon 09/24 6:15 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by ALEX M. AZAR, II.(Layton, Elisabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Fri 09/21 10:57 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Elisabeth Layton on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Nikhel S. Sus (Layton, Elisabeth) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 11/01 5:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties'10 Joint Motion to Stay Case Pending Appeal of Similar Case, the Court GRANTS the Motion. This case is stayed pending final disposition of Saint Francis Medical Center, et al. v. Price , No. 17-5098 (D.C. Cir.). Within 30 days of the issuance of the mandate in the Saint Francis appeal, the parties shall file a joint status report providing their views as to how this case should proceed in light of the Saint Francis decision, and proposing a schedule for further proceedings, if deemed necessary. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 1, 2017. (lcckk1) |
||
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Stay
Thu 10/26 2:32 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of Similar Case by THOMAS E. PRICE(Sus, Nikhel) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Administrative Record
Wed 10/25 2:38 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Certified List of Administrative Record Contents by THOMAS E. PRICE. (Sus, Nikhel) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Thu 10/05 11:10 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendant's8 Answer. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by NOVEMBER 1, 2017 proposing a schedule of proceedings in this matter, which is brought pursuant to the Administrative Procedure Act and 42 U.S.C. § 1395oo(f). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/5/2017. (lcckk1) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 10/05 1:58 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/1/2017. (dot) |
||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 09/25 9:47 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by THOMAS E. PRICE.(Sus, Nikhel) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Tue 08/15 5:11 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/26/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/24/2017. (Gibson, Daniel) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Tue 08/15 5:09 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/26/2017. (Gibson, Daniel) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Tue 08/15 5:08 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. THOMAS E. PRICE served on 7/26/2017 (Gibson, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
.Order
Thu 06/29 10:43 AM
ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 06/29/2017. (DM) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Mon 06/26 4:43 PM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to THOMAS E. PRICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Forms)(jd) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/23 1:43 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by RUSH UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER. (Gibson, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/23 1:41 PM
COMPLAINT against THOMAS E. PRICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5004179) filed by RUSH UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER.(Gibson, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/26 4:39 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (jd) |