Guilbe-Sanchez v. USA
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel R Dominguez |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01855 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment
Wed 04/24 4:10 PM
JUDGMENT: For the reasons stated in the First Circuit Court of Appeals in the Judgment entered at Docket No. 9, Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (Docket No. 1) is hereby DENIED and the case is thus DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ordered that no certificate of appealability should be issued in the event that Petitioner files a notice of appeal because there is no substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(3). THIS CASE IS NOW CLOSED FOR ALL ADMINISTRATIVE AND STATISTICAL PURPOSES. IT IS SO ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 4/24/2019.(MES) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Vacate
Wed 04/24 4:09 PM
ORDER denying1 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 4/24/2019. (MES) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/05 4:11 PM
COPY of JUDGMENT of USCA as to Ricardo L. Guilbe-Sanchez (2) entered on 04/04/09; Petitioner seeks leave to file a second or successive 28 U.S.C. § 2255 motion featuring a challenge to one or more 18 U.S.C. § 924(c) convictions under Johnson v. United States, 135 S. Ct. 2551 (2015) (Johnson II), and related precedent. Accordingly, the application for leave to file a second or successive § 2255 motion is DENIED. Th[is]... denial of an authorization... to file a second or successive application shall not be appealable and shall not be the subject of a petition for rehearing or for a writ of certiorari. (xi) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion In Compliance
Mon 07/23 9:57 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion In Compliance. This case is hereby stayed until the First Circuit Court of Appeals rules on the Petitioner's pending motion. Parties are to inform this Court when the First Circuit issues a ruling in order to reinstate the proceedings. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/23/2018. (MES) |
|
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
In Compliance
Fri 07/20 5:30 PM
Motion In Compliance as to 6 Status Report Order, filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA Responses due by 8/3/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza, Mariana) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Status Report Order
Thu 07/05 1:45 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Parties are to inform the Court the status of the First Circuits ruling on Petitioners application for a second/successive motion. Status Report due by July 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/5/2018. (MES) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Informative Motion
Fri 12/22 9:52 AM
ORDER: This case is hereby stayed until the First Circuit Court of Appeals rules on the Petitioner's pending motions. Parties are to inform this Court when the First Circuit issues a ruling in order to reinstate the proceeding. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 12/22/2017. (MES) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Informative Motion
Thu 12/21 2:44 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Steven Liong-Rodriguez on behalf of USA Responses due by 1/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Liong-Rodriguez, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 11/22 11:32 AM
ORDER: The United States is hereby ordered to respond to Petitioner's motion on or before December 22, 2017. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/22/2017. (MES) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order
Mon 08/14 2:54 PM
STANDING ORDER RE: CODE OF CIVILITY. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/4/2017.(gav) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Fri 06/23 8:02 AM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) and Motion to Stay Proceedings (Criminal Number 97-52) filed by Franco Lorenzo Perez-Redondo on behalf of Ricardo L. Guilbe-Sanchez Responses due by 7/7/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Redondo, Franco) |