Bautista Cayman Asset Company v. Corporacion Nacional de Desarrollo et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Gustavo A Gelpi |
Referred: | Camille L Velez-Rive |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01860 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1345 Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 20, 2017 4:52 AM AST |
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Somoza-Lopez
Condo. Villas de Playa Almirante Apt. 204 Barrio Caguabo
Aasco, PR 00610 |
|
Defendant
Corporacion Nacional de Desarrollo
Urb. Las Vistas #69
Cabo Rojo, PR 00623 |
|
Defendant
Marta Cecilia Lopez-Negron
Condo. Villas de Playa Almirante Apt. 204 Barrio Caguabo
Aasco, PR 00610 |
|
Defendant
Juan Antonio Somoza-Martinez
Condo. Villas de Playa Almirante Apt. 204 Barrio Caguabo
Aasco, PR 00610 |
|
Plaintiff
Bautista Cayman Asset Company
301 Commerce Street Suite 3300
Fort Worth, TX 76102 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
order
Judgment
Tue 05/14 12:01 PM
JUDGMENT is hereby entered DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE the present case. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/14/2019. (AGF) |
|
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 05/14 11:56 AM
ORDER: Granting31 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 5/14/2019. (AGF) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Dismiss
Thu 05/09 9:35 AM
MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice as to All Defendants filed by Julio Nigaglioni-Arrache on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nigaglioni-Arrache, Julio) |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 01/30 11:57 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Julio Nigaglioni-Arrache on behalf of Bautista Cayman Asset Company Suggestions in Opposition to Summary Judgment due by 2/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Nigaglioni-Arrache, Julio) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 10 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order
Fri 03/16 8:24 AM
ORDER. Since this case is stayed, the Initial Settlement and Scheduling Conference referred to the undersigned will be set after the stay is lifted and the case is re-opened. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 03/16/2018. (cvr) |
|
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
Memorandum of the Clerk
Thu 03/15 5:15 PM
MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By26 Order of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi, this case is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive to conduct an Initial Settlement and Scheduling Conference during the month of April 2018. Signed by Clerk on 03/15/2018.(gr) |
|
27 | 27
order
Order on Informative Motion
Thu 03/15 1:12 PM
ORDER: Noted24 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/15/18. (PJH) |
|
26 | 26
3
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/15 8:58 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Camille Velez-Rive for Initial Settlement and Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/15/2018. (gmm) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/14 9:43 AM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Luis R. Santos on behalf of Defendant Corporacion Nacional de Desarrollo.(Santos, Luis) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Informative Motion
Wed 03/14 9:24 AM
INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Luis R. Santos on behalf of Corporacion Nacional de Desarrollo Responses due by 3/28/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Santos, Luis) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Judgment
Thu 03/08 11:54 AM
JUDGMENT is hereby entered STAYING the instant action until June 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/7/2018. (ram) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 03/07 10:05 AM
ORDER: Granting21 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 37/18. (PJH) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Stay
Wed 02/28 2:58 PM
MOTION to Stay filed by Julio Nigaglioni-Arrache on behalf of Bautista Cayman Asset Company Responses due by 3/14/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nigaglioni-Arrache, Julio) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion Submitting
Thu 01/11 4:09 PM
ORDER: Noted19 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/11/18. (PJH) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Submitting
Wed 01/10 2:18 PM
MOTION Submitting Certififed Translations of Exhibits re:14 MOTION for Provisional Remedies filed by Bautista Cayman Asset Company filed by Julio Nigaglioni-Arrache on behalf of Bautista Cayman Asset Company Responses due by 1/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nigaglioni-Arrache, Julio) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 | ||
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion In Compliance
Wed 12/27 1:37 PM
ORDER: Noted17 Motion In Compliance. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/27/17. (PJH) |
|
17 | 17
motion
In Compliance
Wed 12/27 11:52 AM
Motion In Compliance as to 11 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, filed by Julio Nigaglioni-Arrache on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/10/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nigaglioni-Arrache, Julio) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents
Fri 12/22 5:24 PM
ORDER: Granting15 Motion for Leave to File Spanish Language Documents. Certified translations due on or before 2/5/2018 . Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on December 22, 2017. (DVL) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Leave to File Spanish language documents
Fri 12/22 4:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents and request for extension of time to file certified translations filed by Julio Nigaglioni-Arrache on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nigaglioni-Arrache, Julio) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 12/22 4:33 PM
MOTION for Provisional Remedies filed by Julio Nigaglioni-Arrache on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Nigaglioni-Arrache, Julio) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 | ||
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 12/20 4:11 PM
MOTION for extension of time to serve summons by publication upon Marta Cecilia Lopez Negron filed by Julio Nigaglioni-Arrache on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/3/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Nigaglioni-Arrache, Julio) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
12 | 12
motion
Default - Entry
Wed 12/20 2:00 PM
MOTION for Default Entry as to Conjugal Partnership Somoza-Lopez, Corporacion Nacional de Desarrollo, Juan Antonio Somoza-Martinez filed by Julio Nigaglioni-Arrache on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/3/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Nigaglioni-Arrache, Julio) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 12/19 3:50 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff shall inform the Court whether the mortgage subject to this foreclosure action is an FHA insured mortgage for purposes of the Foreclosure Moratorium for properties located within Presidentially-Declared Major Disaster Areas. See HUD Mortgagee Letter 2017-15 of October 20, 2017. Plaintiff must support its submission with competent proof. Plaintiff shall file a motion in compliance with this order on or before December 27, 2017 at NOON. Deadline is firm, no extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/19/2017.(MET) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Tue 10/10 1:34 PM
Summons By Publication Issued as to Marta Cecilia Lopez-Negron (bgl) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Service by Publication
Fri 10/06 11:43 AM
ORDER: Granted8 Motion for Service by Publication. See attached order. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/06/2017. (HR) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Service by Publication
Fri 09/15 6:13 PM
MOTION for Service by Publication as to Marta Cecilia Lopez-Negron filed by Julio Nigaglioni-Arrache on behalf of Bautista Cayman Asset Company Responses due by 9/29/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Nigaglioni-Arrache, Julio) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Summons served, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Sworn Statement, | ||
Att: 3 Order for service of summons by publication, | ||
Att: 4 Summons by Publication | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 09/15 6:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bautista Cayman Asset Company upon Conjugal Partnership Somoza-Lopez served on 8/25/2017, answer due 9/15/2017; Corporacion Nacional de Desarrollo served on 8/25/2017, answer due 9/15/2017; Juan Antonio Somoza-Martinez served on 8/25/2017, answer due 9/15/2017. (Nigaglioni-Arrache, Julio) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Juan Somoza, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Conjugal Partnership | ||
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Tue 08/08 5:10 PM
STANDING ORDER RE: CODE OF CIVILITY. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/1/2017.(cm) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Fri 07/07 4:43 PM
AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: COMMUNICATION BY COUNSEL AND THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/5/2017.(cm) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Tue 06/27 8:43 AM
STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S LAW CLERKS, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/27/2017. (cm) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/26 10:37 AM
Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Somoza-Lopez, Corporacion Nacional de Desarrollo, Marta Cecilia Lopez-Negron, Juan Antonio Somoza-Martinez (arg) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 06/26 9:42 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/23 11:44 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5498916.), filed by Bautista Cayman Asset Company. Service due by 9/21/2017,(Nigaglioni-Arrache, Julio) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 10 Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 11 Disclosure Statement |