Perez-Carrera v. USA
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Gustavo A Gelpi |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01862 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 27, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Mon 01/13 3:44 PM
ORDER: Denying6 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/13/2020. (AGF) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Reopen Case
Mon 01/13 11:17 AM
LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Jose R. Perez-Carrera, Pro se. Responses due by 1/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(gmm) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
order
Memorandum of the Clerk
Mon 04/08 2:12 PM
MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK as Jose R. Perez-Carrera (2): This case is hereby reassigned to the docket of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi, who presides over related Case Number 96-cr-39-02 (GAG). Signed by Clerk on 04/08/2019. (ft) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/08 1:54 PM
COPY of JUDGMENT of USCA as to Jose R. Perez-Carrera (2) entered on 04/05/19; Petitioner seeks leave to file a second or successive 28 U.S.C. § 2255 motion featuring a challenge to one or more 18 U.S.C. § 924(c) convictions under Johnson v. United States, 135 S. Ct. 2551 (2015) (Johnson II), and related precedent. Accordingly, the application for leave to file a second or successive § 2255 motion is DENIED. Th[is]... denial of an authorization... to file a second or successive application shall not be appealable and shall not be the subject of a petition for rehearing or for a writ of certiorari. (xi) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Judgment
Fri 10/27 12:38 PM
JUDGMENT STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Salvador E. Casellas on 10/27/17.(su) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order
Fri 10/27 12:36 PM
ORDER - Pursuant to the Standing Order at Misc. Case No. 16-196, this case is hereby STAYED while the Office of the Federal Public Defender evaluates Petitioner's motion. Signed by Judge Salvador E. Casellas on 10/27/17.(su) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Stay
Fri 06/23 2:52 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Pursuant to Johnson v. USA and MOTION to Stay pending authorization from the Circuit(su). filed by Eleonora C. Marranzini on behalf of Jose R. Perez-Carrera. Responses due by 7/6/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (su) |