Finanance of America Reverse, LLC v. The Estate of Julio Enrique Medina-Colon et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Francisco A Besosa |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01863 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 20, 2017 4:37 AM AST |
Defendant
Centro de Recaudaciones de Ingresos Municipales
|
|
Defendant
Laurienar Flores-Soto
|
|
Defendant
Carmen Maria Lopez-Rosario
|
|
Defendant
Flor de Luz Soto-Medina
|
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Defendant
Jane Doe
|
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
The Estate of Julio Enrique Medina-Colon
|
|
Plaintiff
Finanance of America Reverse, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 21, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
order
Judgment
Wed 08/21 12:18 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/21/2019. (brc) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 08/15 4:44 PM
ORDER re31 Motion to Dismiss: GRANTED. This case is dismissed without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 8/15/2019. (grf) |
|
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw
Thu 08/15 4:42 PM
ORDER re30 Motion to Withdraw : GRANTED. The motion at Docket No. 29 is stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 8/15/2019. (grf) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Dismiss
Thu 08/15 4:11 PM
MOTION to dismiss without prejudice as to All Defendants filed by Valerie N. Hernandez-Hernandez on behalf of Finanance of America Reverse, LLC Responses due by 8/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Withdraw
Thu 08/15 4:09 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Motion filed at Docket 29 re:29 MOTION to dismiss as to All Defendants filed by Charline M. Jimenez-Echevarria on behalf of CHARLINE M JIMENEZ Responses due by 8/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Jimenez-Echevarria, Charline) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Dismiss
Thu 08/15 3:46 PM
MOTION to dismiss as to All Defendants filed by Charline M. Jimenez-Echevarria on behalf of Finanance of America Reverse, LLC Responses due by 8/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Jimenez-Echevarria, Charline) |
|
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion requesting Order
Tue 02/12 4:27 PM
ORDER re26 Motion Requesting Order: DENIED. The Court does not know if the Jane Doe and John Doe defendants are diverse. This matter should be brought in the Commonwealth's Court. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/12/2019. (brc) |
|
27 | 27
order
Partial Judgment
Tue 02/12 1:32 PM
PARTIAL JUDGMENT dismissing plaintiff's claims against Ms. Laurienar Flores-Soto and Ms. Flor de Luz Soto-Medina without prejudice. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/12/2019. (brc) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Requesting Order
Tue 02/12 12:49 PM
MOTION requesting Order to compel filed by Valerie N. Hernandez-Hernandez on behalf of Finanance of America Reverse, LLC Responses due by 2/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
25 | 25
order
Order
Tue 02/12 12:00 PM
ORDER re23 Notice of Filing Exhibits: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/12/2019. (brc) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion requesting Order
Tue 02/12 11:57 AM
ORDER re22 Motion Requesting Order: GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against Ms. Laurienar Flores-Soto and Ms. Flor de Luz Soto-Medina are DISMISSED without prejudice. There being no just reason for delay, partial judgment shall be entered accordingly. Luis Jimenez-Lopez shall be included as a defendant, as the tutor of Carmen Maria Lopez-Rosario. ( See Docket No. 5, process served on Mr. Jimenez-Lopez.) Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/12/2019. (brc) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Filing Exhibits
Tue 02/12 11:01 AM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibits sworn statement re22 MOTION requesting Order REQUESTING DISMISSAL OF THE ACTION AGAINST CERTAIN DEFENDANTS AND TO INCLUDE THE NEW KNOWN TOTUR OF CO-DEFENDANT CARMEN MARIA LOPEZ ROSARIO filed by Finanance of America Reverse, LLC (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Requesting Order
Tue 02/12 10:44 AM
MOTION requesting Order REQUESTING DISMISSAL OF THE ACTION AGAINST CERTAIN DEFENDANTS AND TO INCLUDE THE NEW KNOWN TOTUR OF CO-DEFENDANT CARMEN MARIA LOPEZ ROSARIO filed by Valerie N. Hernandez-Hernandez on behalf of Finanance of America Reverse, LLC Responses due by 2/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion requesting Order
Fri 11/16 5:56 PM
ORDER re20 Motion Requesting Order: GRANTED. The stay is vacated and this case may proceed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/16/2018. (brc) |
|
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Requesting Order
Thu 11/15 11:23 AM
MOTION requesting Order to reopen the proceedings filed by Valerie N. Hernandez-Hernandez on behalf of Finanance of America Reverse, LLC Responses due by 11/29/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion requesting Order
Thu 08/23 6:55 PM
ORDER re18 Motion Requesting Order: GRANTED. This is absolutely the final stay which will be granted. Plaintiff will continue prosecuting this action once the stay is vacated, or the action will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/23/2018. (brc) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Requesting Order
Thu 08/23 4:42 PM
MOTION requesting Order to stay the proceedings in compliance with HUD's regulations filed by Valerie N. Hernandez-Hernandez on behalf of Finanance of America Reverse, LLC Responses due by 9/6/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion requesting Order
Tue 06/26 2:20 PM
ORDER re16 Motion Requesting Order: GRANTED. This case is stayed until August 16, 2018. This is the final extension of the stay. Any request to extend the stay past August 16, 2018 will be denied. The case will be dismissed without prejudice, and plaintiff may refile it once any stay is extended past August 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/26/2018. (brc) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Requesting Order
Tue 06/26 2:05 PM
Lp_prefix_1 MOTION requesting Order to extend the stay of the proceedings filed by Valerie N. Hernandez-Hernandez on behalf of Finanance of America Reverse, LLC Responses due by 7/10/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion requesting Order
Mon 04/02 1:05 PM
ORDER re14 Motion Requesting Order: GRANTED. This case is stayed until May 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 04/02/2018. (brc) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Requesting Order
Thu 03/29 9:40 AM
MOTION requesting Order to stay the proceedings filed by Valerie N. Hernandez-Hernandez on behalf of Finanance of America Reverse, LLC Responses due by 4/12/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion requesting Order
Thu 12/28 12:10 PM
ORDER re12 Motion Requesting Order: GRANTED. This case is stayed until March 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/28/2017. (brc) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Requesting Order
Thu 12/28 11:42 AM
MOTION requesting Order filed by Valerie N. Hernandez-Hernandez on behalf of Finanance of America Reverse, LLC Responses due by 1/11/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 12/06 11:09 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Finanance of America Reverse, LLC upon (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 12/01 8:58 AM
NOTICE of filing exhibit Statement Under Penalty of Perjury by Finanance of America Reverse, LLC re1 Complaint,, (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 12/01 8:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Finanance of America Reverse, LLC upon United States of America served on 7/12/2017, answer due 9/11/2017. (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 12/01 8:23 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Finanance of America Reverse, LLC upon Centro de Recaudaciones de Ingresos Municipales served on 7/12/2017, answer due 8/2/2017. (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 12/01 8:22 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon the tutor of Carmen Lopez-Rosario as member of the estate of Julio Enrique Medina Colon by Finanance of America Reverse, LLC upon Carmen Maria Lopez-Rosario served on 7/12/2017, answer due 8/29/2017. (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
misc
Notice of Docket Text Modification
Mon 12/04 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re:9 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. ***FILED IN ERROR Incomplete PDF, Counsel to re-file corrected PDF.*** (idg) |
||
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 11/02 1:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Carmen Maria Lopez Rosario as member of the Estate by Finanance of America Reverse, LLC upon The Estate of Julio Enrique Medina-Colon served on 8/8/2017, answer due 8/29/2017. (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 11/02 1:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed to the tutor of Carmen Maria Lopez Rosario by Finanance of America Reverse, LLC upon (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 11/02 11:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Carmen Rosario by Finanance of America Reverse, LLC upon Carmen Maria Lopez-Rosario served on 8/8/2017, answer due 8/29/2017. (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/26 10:56 AM
Summons Issued as to Centro de Recaudaciones de Ingresos Municipales, Laurienar Flores-Soto, Jane Doe as member of the Estate of Julio Enrique Medina Colon, John Doe as member of the Estate of Julio Enrique Medina Colon, Carmen Maria Lopez-Rosario, Flor de Luz Soto-Medina, United States of America (arg) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 06/26 10:03 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/23 2:07 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5499513.), filed by Finanance of America Reverse, LLC. Service due by 9/21/2017,(Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Mortgage, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Note, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Sworn Title Study, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Certificate of Conversion, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit SCRA Carmen, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit SCRA Julio, | ||
Att: 7 Summons CRIM, | ||
Att: 8 Summons USA, | ||
Att: 9 Summons Jane, | ||
Att: 10 Summons John, | ||
Att: 11 Summons Carmen, | ||
Att: 12 Summons Lauri, | ||
Att: 13 Summons Flor, | ||
Att: 14 Summons Carmen -Tutor, | ||
Att: 15 Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 16 Civil Cover Sheet |