Suarez-Torres v. Municipality of San Juan et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Francisco A Besosa |
Referred: | Bruce J Mcgiverin |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01866 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA) |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 20, 2017 4:42 AM AST |
Defendant
Municipality of San Juan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sandia, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Maria Suarez-Torres
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Terminated: 11/15/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM AST |
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
order
Order
Wed 11/28 2:37 PM
ORDER re 5 Memorandum of the Clerk, and4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. The referral to Magistrate Judge McGiverin is VACATED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/28/2018. (brc) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
order
Judgment
Mon 02/12 3:20 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT DISMISSING this case with prejudice as to defendant Municipality of San Juan, and without prejudice as to the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Sandia, LLC. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/12/2018. (brc) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion to Set Aside
Thu 01/25 4:11 PM
ORDER re35 Motion to Set Aside : GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against the Municipality of San Juan are dismissed with prejudice. Initial Scheduling Conference set for January 26, 2018 is set aside. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 1/25/2018. (grf) |
|
35 | 35
motion
Set Aside
Thu 01/25 2:48 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Initial Scheduling Conference filed by Hector Benitez-Arraiza on behalf of Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 2/8/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Benitez-Arraiza, Hector) Modified on 1/25/2018 to edit docket text(ab) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 01/25 2:47 PM
Joint NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Municipality of San Juan, Maria Suarez-Torres (Benitez-Arraiza, Hector) Modified on 1/25/2018 to add filer (ab) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Case Management Memorandum
Wed 01/17 11:21 AM
Joint CASE MANAGEMENT MEMORANDUM by Municipality of San Juan. (Benitez-Arraiza, Hector) |
|
32 | 32
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 01/17 9:25 AM
ORDER : Initial Scheduling Conference is RESET for 1/26/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 1/17/2018.(grf) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 01/12 5:18 PM
ORDER re30 Motion for extension of time: GRANTED. Joint Case Management Memorandum due January 17, 2018 at 12:00 noon. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/12/2018. (brc) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 01/12 4:41 PM
Joint MOTION for extension of time until January 17, 2018 to File "Joint Case Management Memorandum" filed by Hector Benitez-Arraiza on behalf of Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 1/26/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Benitez-Arraiza, Hector) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment
Wed 01/03 11:05 AM
ORDER re28 Motion to Set Aside Judgment: DENIED. Plaintiff previously filed another case against Sandia LLC, 16-1882 (PAD). Counsel is warned not to play fast and loose with the Court. A word to the wise... Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/03/2018. (brc) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Set Aside Judgment
Tue 01/02 11:12 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Judgment as to Sandia, LLC filed by Jose Carlos Velez-Colon on behalf of Maria Suarez-Torres Responses due by 1/16/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Velez-Colon, Jose) |
|
27 | 27
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 01/02 11:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Suarez-Torres upon Sandia, LLC served on 12/20/2017, answer due 1/10/2018. (Velez-Colon, Jose) |
|
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion requesting Order
Tue 01/02 5:57 PM
ORDER re24 Motion Requesting Order: DENIED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/02/2018. (brc) |
|
25 | 25
order
Partial Judgment
Tue 01/02 4:04 PM
PARTIAL JUDGMENT dismissing plaintiff's claims against defendant Sandia LLC without prejudice. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/02/2018. (brc) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Requesting Order
Tue 01/02 3:29 PM
MOTION requesting Order filed by Jose Carlos Velez-Colon on behalf of Maria Suarez-Torres Responses due by 1/16/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Velez-Colon, Jose) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit I | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Informative Motion
Tue 01/02 3:16 PM
ORDER re21 Informative Motion: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/02/2018. (brc) |
|
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 01/02 3:04 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS. Plaintiff's claims against defendant Sandia LLC are DISMISSED without prejudice. Partial judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 01/02/2018. (brc) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Informative Motion
Tue 01/02 2:42 PM
Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Parties' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Meeting filed by Giselle M. Martinez-Velazquez on behalf of Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 1/16/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Velazquez, Giselle) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/15 5:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hector Benitez-Arraiza on behalf of Municipality of San Juan (Benitez-Arraiza, Hector) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Partial Judgment
Wed 11/15 12:24 PM
PARTIAL JUDGMENT dismissing plaintiff's claims against the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico without prejudice. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/15/2017. (brc) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 11/15 12:01 PM
ORDER re16 Response to Order to Show Cause: NOTED. Plaintiff's claims against the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico are DISMISSED, without prejudice. There being no just reason for delay, partial judgment shall be entered accordingly. Plaintiff shall serve defendant Sandia, LLC by publication no later than December 31, 2017. No extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/15/2017. (brc) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order
Wed 11/15 11:39 AM
ORDER re15 Response to Order to Show Cause. Stricken from the record as erroneously filed. See Docket No. 16. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/15/2017. (brc) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Wed 11/15 11:01 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Maria Suarez-Torres Re:14 Order to Show Cause, filed by Maria Suarez-Torres. (Velez-Colon, Jose) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Wed 11/15 10:43 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Maria Suarez-Torres Re:14 Order to Show Cause, filed by Maria Suarez-Torres. (Velez-Colon, Jose) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 11/01 3:31 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. No later than November 15, 2017, plaintiff will show cause why her claims against the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Sandia, LLC should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to serve process on them within the time set forth in Rule 4(m). Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/01/2017. (brc) |
|
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order - Case Management Order
Wed 11/01 9:28 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/4/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/19/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Pretrial/Settlement Conference set for 8/24/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Discovery due by 3/28/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/20/2018. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/1/2017.(grf) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion requesting Order
Tue 10/31 10:14 AM
ORDER re11 Motion requesting Order: GRANTED. A case management order will be issued forthwith. Discovery due by 3/28/2018. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/31/2017. (grf) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Requesting Order
Mon 10/30 10:17 PM
MOTION requesting Order filed by Jose Carlos Velez-Colon on behalf of Maria Suarez-Torres Responses due by 11/13/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Velez-Colon, Jose) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/22 11:05 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Victor D. Candelario-Vega on behalf of Municipality of San Juan (Candelario-Vega, Victor) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/22 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Giselle M. Martinez-Velazquez on behalf of Municipality of San Juan (Martinez-Velazquez, Giselle) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 08/22 10:54 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Giselle M. Martinez-Velazquez on behalf of Defendant Municipality of San Juan.(Martinez-Velazquez, Giselle) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Informative Motion
Thu 08/17 2:55 PM
ORDER re6 Informative Motion: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/17/2017. (brc) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Informative Motion
Thu 08/17 2:08 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Recent Developments in ADA Case Law filed by Jose Carlos Velez-Colon on behalf of Maria Suarez-Torres Responses due by 8/31/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Velez-Colon, Jose) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Memorandum of the Clerk
Thu 07/20 5:26 PM
MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK. Pursuant to the Order entered by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 7/20/17 (Docket No. 4), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. Signed by Clerk on 7/20/17.(gsr) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/20 12:20 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce McGiverin. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/20/2017. (brc) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/26 11:37 AM
Summons Issued as to Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Municipality of San Juan, Sandia, LLC (arg) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 06/26 10:05 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/23 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5499908.), filed by Maria Suarez-Torres. Service due by 9/21/2017,(Velez-Colon, Jose) |
|
Att: 1 Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons |