Rivera-Rivera v. USA
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel R Dominguez |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01868 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 10, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment
Tue 12/10 12:40 PM
JUDGMENT. Pursuant to the Court's Order (Dkt. No. 14) denying Petitioners Petition under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 (Docket No. 1), the Court hereby enters final judgment DISMISSING THE INSTANT CASE WITH PREJUDICE. THIS CASE IS NOW CLOSED FOR ALL ADMINISTRATIVE AND STATISTICAL PURPOSES.IT IS SO ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 12/10/2019. (CBM) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 12/10 12:02 PM
ORDER. After careful examination of the docket, the Court finds that there is another, posterior duplicative case at 18-1316 In said case, the Petitioner sought leave to file a second or successive 2255 Motion, and the Court of Appeals denied the request. Therefore, this Court holds that the same reasoning applies to the instant case. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 12/10/2019.(CBM) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss
Tue 09/18 4:08 PM
MOTION to dismiss as to Jose A. Rivera-Rivera filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA Responses due by 10/2/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza, Mariana) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 09/12 5:40 PM
ORDER granting11 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 12, 2018 to File Response/Reply. IT IS SO ORDERED. Replies due by 10/12/2018. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 9/12/2018. (JAM) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 09/12 5:34 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until October 12, 2018 to File Response/Reply filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA Responses due by 9/26/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza, Mariana) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 08/13 6:01 PM
ORDER granting9 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 12, 2018 to File Response/Reply. IT IS SO ORDERED. Replies due by 9/12/2018. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/13/2018. (JAM) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 08/13 5:55 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until September 12, 2018 to File Response/Reply filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA Responses due by 8/27/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza, Mariana) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 07/13 9:18 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time until August 13, 2018 to File Response/Reply. IT IS SO ORDERED. Replies due by 8/13/2018. Motions due by 8/13/2018. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/13/2018. (JAM) |
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 07/12 6:00 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until August 12, 2018 to File Response/Reply filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA Responses due by 7/26/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza, Mariana) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 06/12 6:12 PM
ORDER granting5 MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/12/2018 to File Response/Reply as to1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 05-033) filed by Jose A. Rivera-Rivera. IT IS SO ORDERED. Replies due by 7/12/2018. Motions due by 7/12/2018. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 6/12/2018. (JAM) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 06/12 5:40 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/12/2018 to File Response/Reply as to1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 05-033) filed by Jose A. Rivera-Rivera filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA Responses due by 6/26/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza, Mariana) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Wed 05/30 4:45 PM
ORDER. The Government and Mr. Adams-Quesada shall file a status report by June 12, 2018, including the next course of action to move this case forward. The Court notes that this case has been inactive since the date of filing, that is, June 23, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 5/30/2018.(JAM) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Mon 08/14 2:56 PM
STANDING ORDER RE: CODE OF CIVILITY. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/4/2017.(gav) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Fri 06/23 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Fri 06/23 4:02 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 05-033) filed by Jose A. Rivera-Rivera. Responses due by 7/7/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (arg) |