Serrano-Cruz v. USA
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Juan M Perez-Gimenez |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01871 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 28, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 10/14 1:22 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to10 Notice of Appeal, filed by Luis Serrano-Cruz; DENIED/TERMINATED. RE:13 USCA JUDGMENT (mcm) |
|
Friday, August 21, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
appeal
USCA Judgment
Fri 08/21 2:23 PM
USCA JUDGMENT as to10 Notice of Appeal, filed by Luis Serrano-Cruz; Petitioner seeks a certificate of appealability ("COA") in relation to the district court's denial of a 28 U.S.C. § 2255 motion featuring a challenge to one or more 18 U.S.C. § 924(c) convictions under Johnson v. United States, 135 S. Ct. 2551 (2015) (Johnson II), and related precedent. We conclude, after review of the arguments sufficiently developed in the COA application and the response to the order to show cause, as well as relevant portions of the record, that the district court's ultimate denial of § 2255 relief was neither debatable nor wrong. Accordingly, the application for COA is DENIED, and this appeal is TERMINATED. (xi) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 09/12 2:12 PM
USCA Case Number 18-1880 for10 Notice of Appeal, filed by Luis Serrano-Cruz. (xi) |
|
11 | 11
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA
Wed 09/12 11:36 AM
Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re10 Notice of Appeal, [Docket Entries 8, 9 & 10] (xi) |
|
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 09/04 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Luis Serrano-Cruz. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel should register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf/. Counsel should also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm (Marranzini, Eleonora) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment
Tue 08/28 4:41 PM
JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice. This case is now closed. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 08/28/2018. (NNR) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Vacate
Tue 08/28 4:40 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Dismiss; denying1 Motion to Vacate. For the reasons stated in the Government's unopposed Motion to Dismiss, with which the Court agrees, Petitioner's Motion to Vacate (2255) is hereby DENIED and the case is thus DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. It is further ordered that no certificate of appealability should be issued in the event that Petitioner files a notice of appeal because there is no substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(2). Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 08/28/2018. (NNR) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Wed 08/01 1:45 PM
MOTION to dismiss as to Luis Serrano-Cruz filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA Responses due by 8/15/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza, Mariana) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 07/03 2:33 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response to Motion Deadline due by 8/2/2018. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 07/03/2018. (NNR) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 07/02 5:51 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until August 2, 2018 to File Response/Reply filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA Responses due by 7/16/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza, Mariana) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 06/04 12:14 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response to Motion Deadline due by 7/2/2018. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 06/04/2018. (NNR) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 06/01 5:34 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/2/2018 to File Response/Reply as to1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 93-280) filed by Luis Serrano-Cruz filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA Responses due by 6/15/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza, Mariana) |
|
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 04/17 5:51 PM
ORDER. The Government shall file its response to petitioner's1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) by June 1, 2018. Response to Motion due by 6/1/2018. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 04/17/2018.(NNR) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Fri 06/23 4:24 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 93-280) filed by Eleonora C. Marranzini on behalf of Luis Serrano-Cruz. Responses due by 7/7/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gav) |