Santiago-Rodriguez v. USA
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Juan M Perez-Gimenez |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01874 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 02, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/08 4:12 PM
COPY of JUDGMENT of USCA as to Jose Raul Santiago-Rodriguez (1) entered on 04/05/19; Petitioner seeks leave to file a second or successive 28 U.S.C. § 2255 motion featuring achallenge to one or more 18 U.S.C. § 924(c) convictions under Johnson v. United States, 135 S. Ct. 2551 (2015) (Johnson II), and related precedent. Accordingly, the application for leave to file a second or successive § 2255 motion is DENIED. Th[is]... denial of an authorization... to file a second or successive application shall not be appealable and shall not be the subject of a petition for rehearing or for a writ of certiorari. (xi) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment
Mon 07/02 5:00 PM
JUDGMENT staying case. The Clerk of Court shall take note. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 7/2/2018.(PMA) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion In Compliance
Mon 07/02 4:57 PM
ORDER noted4 Motion In Compliance. The court will thus enter judgment staying the instant case pending the First Circuit's ruling. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 7/2/2018. (PMA) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
motion
In Compliance
Thu 06/14 12:16 PM
Motion In Compliance with Court Order at D.E. #3 filed by Jessica Earl on behalf of Jose Raul Santiago-Rodriguez Responses due by 6/28/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Earl, Jessica) |
|
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 05/14 3:31 PM
ORDER: Within 30 days of entry of this order, the petitioner shall inform the court of the status of his application for leave to file a second or successive motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. sec. 2255. Status Report due by 6/13/2018. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 5/14/2018.(PMA) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order Staying Case
Mon 07/03 2:02 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE, granting in part1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) and Motion to Stay Proceedings (Criminal Number 96-244) filed by Jose Raul Santiago-Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 7/3/2017.(PMA) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Fri 06/23 5:48 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) and Motion to Stay Proceedings (Criminal Number 96-244) filed by Jessica Earl on behalf of Jose Raul Santiago-Rodriguez Responses due by 7/7/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Earl, Jessica) |