Hanifen v. CenturyLink Inc. et al
Idaho District Court | |
Judge: | Candy W Dale |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00267 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 22, 2017 2:04 AM MST |
Defendant
CenturyLink Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CenturyTel of the Gem State, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1 through 50
|
|
Plaintiff
Mandi Hanifen
individually and as the representative of a class of similarly-situated persons Walsh PLLC PO Box 7
Bly, OR 97622 |
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit filed against CenturyLink, customers claim they were unfairly billed (ktvb.com) |
Submitted Mon 06/26/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 10/11 1:23 PM
NOTICE: Case transferred electronically to District of Minnesota, re23 Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel (jp) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
4
pgs
order
Order Transferring Case to MDL Panel
Wed 10/11 1:18 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MDL PANEL for District of Minnesota (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
4
pgs
order
Order CTO
Thu 10/05 9:02 AM
TRANSFER ORDER entered by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation re MDL No. 2795(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs) |
|
Att: 1 Text Only MINUTE ORDER | ||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Consents (All are in)
Tue 09/26 7:47 AM
ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (jp) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Consent Filed
Tue 09/12 1:45 PM
Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 09/13 2:41 PM
Plaintiffs' Continued Response in Support of Consolidation Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407 and for Transfer of Related Actions to the District of Arizona or, Alternatively, to the District of Minnesota by Mandi Hanifen (from MDL 2795)(jp) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/30 2:04 PM
Plaintiffs' Response in Support of Consolidation Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1407 and for Transfer of Related Actions to the District of Arizona (docket number 19 in MDL 2795)(jp) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
1 - Terminate Hearings Order
Fri 08/25 4:35 PM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - This matter is presently stayed, and the Court is awaiting a a status report from the parties on or after October 31, 2017. Accordingly, the Court hereby VACATES the telephonic scheduling conference set for August 28, 2017 at 10:30 a.m., to be reset at a later date if necessary. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 08/02 3:53 PM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting14 Motion to Stay. Upon review of the unopposed motion, the Court finds good cause to grant a temporary stay of proceedings until the MDL Panel determines the pending motion to transfer. The stay will be in effect until October 31, 2017. The parties are to submit a status report on or before October 31, 2017, regarding the status of the motion. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/02 1:05 PM
Service Copy of Motion to Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by CenturyLink Inc.(jp) |
|
Att: 1 Motion of Centurylink Inc and its subsidiaries for Transfer of Actions pursuant to 28 U.S. C. §1407, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 3 Schedule of Actions, | ||
Att: 4 Ex. 1, | ||
Att: 5 Ex. 2, | ||
Att: 6 Ex. 3, | ||
Att: 7 Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 8 Dist of Arizona (2:17-cv-2162-GMS), | ||
Att: 9 District of California (2:17-cv-4504-SJO), | ||
Att: 10 District of Colorado (1:17-cv-1561-MSK), | ||
Att: 11 District of FL (6:17-cv-1309-CEM), | ||
Att: 12 District of ID (1:17-cv-267-CWD), | ||
Att: 13 District of MN (0:17-cv-2832-MJD), | ||
Att: 14 District of Las Vegas (2:17-cv-1794-RFB), | ||
Att: 15 District of Oregon (3:17-cv-963-PK), | ||
Att: 16 W. District of Washington (3:17-cv-5487-RJB) | ||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 08/03 9:13 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Per Order dkt 16, Status Report due by 10/31/2017. (jp) |
||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Stay
Tue 08/01 3:15 PM
MOTION to Stay Unopposed Motion for a Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending Ruling of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Kelly Alfred Cameron appearing for Defendants CenturyLink Inc., CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of the Gem State, Inc.. Responses due by 8/22/2017(Cameron, Kelly) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 08/01 3:10 PM
NOTICE by CenturyLink Inc., CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of the Gem State, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Filing With Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Cameron, Kelly) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline
Wed 07/26 9:46 AM
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for CenturyLink Inc., CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of the Gem State, Inc., Mandi Hanifen re7 Stipulation,1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/25/2017. (jp) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance
Wed 07/26 9:34 AM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving10 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Douglas P Lobel for CenturyLink Inc., CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., & CenturyTel of the Gem State, Inc. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Pro Hac Vice Appearance
Thu 07/20 10:55 AM
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Douglas P. Lobel. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1612448.)Kelly Alfred Cameron appearing for Defendants CenturyLink Inc., CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of the Gem State, Inc.. Responses due by 8/10/2017 (Cameron, Kelly) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/18 4:21 PM
ORDER Granting Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint, re7 Stipulation. CenturyLink Inc., CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyLink Inc. answer due 8/18/2017. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/14 11:37 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CenturyLink Inc., CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of the Gem State, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc. for CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of the Gem State, Inc.; Corporate Parent CenturyLink, Inc. for CenturyLink Inc... (Cameron, Kelly) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Fri 07/14 11:08 AM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by CenturyLink Inc., CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of the Gem State, Inc.. (Cameron, Kelly) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance
Wed 07/05 8:43 AM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving4 &5 Applications for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorneys Mark John Geragos and Benjamin Jared Meiselas for Mandi Hanifen. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Pro Hac Vice Appearance
Mon 07/03 12:30 PM
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Benjamin Jared Meiselas. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1606053.)Bonner Charles Walsh appearing for Plaintiff Mandi Hanifen. Responses due by 7/24/2017 (Walsh, Bonner) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Pro Hac Vice Appearance
Mon 07/03 12:27 PM
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Mark John Geragos. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1606050.)Bonner Charles Walsh appearing for Plaintiff Mandi Hanifen. Responses due by 7/24/2017 (Walsh, Bonner) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Litigation Order
Mon 06/26 3:03 PM
LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Plaintiff must serve this Order on all parties who have not entered an appearance via PACER to date. Unless the Plaintiff contacts the Courtroom Deputy, Amy Tate, and requests a different date and time, the Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on August 8, 2017, at 10:30 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before August 21, 2017, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. Case Management deadline set for 8/21/2017 - joint Litigation and Discovery Plan due. (km) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/26 2:54 PM
Summons Issued as to CenturyLink Inc., CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of the Gem State, Inc.. (Print attached Summons for service.) (km) |
|
Att: 1 Summons CenturtyTel of Gem State, | ||
Att: 2 CenturyTel of Idaho | ||
Sunday, June 25, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
22
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Sun 06/25 5:45 PM
COMPLAINT Class Action Allegations against CenturyLink Inc., CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of the Gem State, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1603261.), filed by Mandi Hanifen.(Walsh, Bonner) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Proposed to CenturyLink Inc., | ||
Att: 3 Summons Proposed to CenturyTel Gem State Inc., | ||
Att: 4 Summons Proposed to CenturyTel Idaho Inc. |