F. Lee Bailey
Maine Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 13 | |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-20323 |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2017 |
Creditor
Internal Revenue Service
|
|
Creditor
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
|
|
Debtor
Bailey and Elliott Consulting
|
|
Debtor
F. Lee Bailey
|
|
Debtor
Francis Lee Bailey
|
|
Trustee
Andrew M. Dudley
|
|
Trustee
Peter C. Fessenden
|
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee
|
Docket last updated: 06/27/2017 9:05 AM EDT |
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 06/26 10:31 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) 17-20323 [misc,volp13a] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 3958177. Fee amount 310.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
9
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)
Mon 06/26 10:30 AM
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $ 310 Filed by F. Lee Bailey. Section 316 Incomplete Filing Date 08/10/2017. Atty Disclosure Statement due 07/10/2017. Chapter 13 Plan due by 07/10/2017.Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1 Due 07/10/2017 Schedule A/B due 07/10/2017. Schedule C due 07/10/2017. Schedule D due 07/10/2017. Schedule E/F due 07/10/2017. Schedule G due 07/10/2017. Schedule H due 07/10/2017. Schedule I due 07/10/2017. Schedule J due 07/10/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 07/10/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 07/10/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 07/10/2017. (Molleur, James) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Credit Counseling
Mon 06/26 10:32 AM
Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by F. Lee Bailey. (Molleur, James) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order to Comply
Mon 06/26 3:27 PM
Order to Comply and Notice to Dismiss Case. Deficiency Requested: All schedules and statements, Chapter 13 Plan. Incomplete Filings due by 7/10/2017. Chapter 13 Plan due by 7/10/2017. (rmp) |