Murner Burgess et al v. Takeda Pharmaceutical Co Ltd et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Rebecca F Doherty |
Referred: | Patrick J Hanna |
Case #: | 6:17-mc-00115 |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 12, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Judgment Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Sealed Motion Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 07/12 1:17 PM
JUDGMENT ADOPTING2 Report and Recommendations. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the1 Motion to Approve Settlement is hereby GRANTED pursuant to the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Hanna which is hereby adopted. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 7/11/2017. (crt,Guidry, C) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Report and Recommendations
Thu 06/29 3:48 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 SEALED MOTION Approving Settlement Amount, Contingency Fee and Advanced Costs filed by Tammy Murner Pace, Timothy Fleming Murner, Teresa Gail Murner Burgess, Tiffany Rebecca Murner. Objections to R&R due by 7/9/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/29/2017. (crt,Williams, L) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Sealed Motion (Sealed Pleading)
Mon 06/26 4:08 PM
SEALED MOTION Approving Settlement Amount, Contingency Fee and Advanced Costs by Tiffany Rebecca Murner, Timothy Fleming Murner, Teresa Gail Murner Burgess, Tammy Murner Pace.(Attorney Patrick C Morrow added to party Tiffany Rebecca Murner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick C Morrow added to party Timothy Fleming Murner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick C Morrow added to party Teresa Gail Murner Burgess(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick C Morrow added to party Tammy Murner Pace(pty:pla))(aty,Morrow, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Attorney Verification, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
misc
Electronic Payment of Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee
Mon 06/26 4:09 PM
ELECTRONIC PAYMENT of Miscellaneous Case filing fee by Tiffany Rebecca Murner, Timothy Fleming Murner, Teresa Gail Murner Burgess, Tammy Murner Pace. ( Filing Fee: $47, receipt number 0536-3398603) . (aty,Morrow, Patrick) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/28 10:19 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Rebecca F Doherty and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Williams, L) |