Forever 21, Inc. v. Gucci America, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | S James Otero |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-04706 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 23, 2017 12:54 AM PST |
Counter Claimant
Gucci America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Forever 21, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gucci America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Forever 21, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Guccio Gucci S.p.A.
Terminated: 10/04/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |