Zakinov v. Blue Buffalo Pet Products, Inc
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony J Battaglia |
Referred: | William V Gallo |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01301 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1453 Class Action Fairness Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 23, 2017 1:42 AM PST |
Defendant
Blue Buffalo Pet Products, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vladi Zakinov
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 03/22 3:49 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court GRANTS both Defendant's request for judicial notice and its motion to dismiss. Desiring to avoid piecemeal litigation, Plaintiff's FAC is DISMISSED on res judicata grounds WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case.(acc) |
|
33 | 33
13
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 03/22 3:46 PM
ORDER granting19 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Court GRANTS both Defendant's request for judicial notice and its motion to dismiss. Desiring to avoid piecemeal litigation, Plaintiff's FAC is DISMISSED on res judicata grounds WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/22/2018. (acc) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/01 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph C. Bourne on behalf of Vladi Zakinov(Bourne, Joseph)Attorney Joseph C. Bourne added to party Vladi Zakinov (pty:pla) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk
Wed 02/14 1:05 PM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Katherine W. Van Dyck appearing for Plaintiff Vladi Zakinov (no document attached) (jrd) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/14 11:46 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10917391 Re: Doc. No.28 )(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Van Dyck, Katherine)(jrd) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk
Wed 02/14 11:15 AM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Charles J. LaDuca appearing for Plaintiff Vladi Zakinov (no document attached) (jrd) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/14 11:11 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10917391.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(QC Mailer; missing signature.)(Van Dyck, Katherine)(jrd) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/14 11:06 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10917318.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(LaDuca, Charles)(jrd) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order ~Util - Motions Submitted
Wed 02/07 11:04 AM
ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA, Motions Submitted19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. This motion is suitable for determination on the papers and without oral argument in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7.1.d.1. Accordingly, no appearances are required and the motion will be deemed submitted as of this date. (no document attached) (sc) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 01/18 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Vladi Zakinov re19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint(McKany, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Zeiger v. Wellpet LLC MTD Order | ||
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 12/22 2:44 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint [in Support of Request for Judicial Notice Regarding Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint] filed by Blue Buffalo Pet Products, Inc. (Brecht, Celeste) |
|
23 | 23
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 12/22 2:35 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Blue Buffalo Pet Products, Inc. (Brecht, Celeste) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 12/05 6:47 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant Blue Buffalo Company Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Vladi Zakinov. (Peterson, Rebecca) QC that this Memo of P's & A's must be an attachment to doc 21(acc) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 12/05 5:45 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice of Defendant Blue Buffalo Company Ltd's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Vladi Zakinov. (Peterson, Rebecca)(acc) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order Setting Briefing Schedule
Tue 11/07 3:36 PM
ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re19 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint : Pursuant to stipulation by the parties, Responses due by 12/5/2017; Replies due by 12/22/2017; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 2/22/18 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(no document attached) (sc) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Tue 11/07 3:19 PM
MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Blue Buffalo Pet Products, Inc.(Brecht, Celeste) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice ISO Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint | ||
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 10/24 1:45 PM
ORDER granting17 Joint Motion to Set Briefing Schedule. Defendant Blue Buffalo must file Motion to Dismiss by 11/7/2017. Plaintiff must respond to said motion by 12/5/2017. Defendant Blue Buffalo must file its reply by 12/22/2017. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/24/2017. (jah) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File
Mon 10/23 1:31 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File and to Set Briefing Schedule by Vladi Zakinov. (McKany, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 10/17 11:01 AM
ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: finding as moot11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, in light of Plaintiff's amended complaint. (no document attached) (sc) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
29
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 10/10 11:44 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Blue Buffalo Pet Products, Inc, filed by Vladi Zakinov. (Peterson, Rebecca)(acc) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/03 12:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vladi Zakinov. Blue Buffalo Pet Products, Inc served. (McKany, Steven)(acc) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 09/01 9:42 AM
ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA, Set/Reset Deadlines as to11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Responses due by 10/10/2017, Replies due by 10/30/2017, sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(no document attached) (sc) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Setting Briefing Schedule
Thu 08/31 10:56 AM
ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA Setting Briefing Schedule re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Responses due by 9/14/2017, Replies due by 9/21/2017, sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 12/21/17 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(no document attached) (sc) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 08/30 3:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Blue Buffalo Pet Products, Inc.(Brecht, Celeste) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 08/30 2:54 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Buffalo Pet Products, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Blue Pet Products, Inc. for Blue Buffalo Pet Products, Inc.. (Brecht, Celeste) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk
Thu 07/27 4:22 PM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Robert K. Shelquist appearing for Plaintiff Vladi Zakinov (no document attached) (jrd) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/27 11:29 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10289962.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Shelquist, Robert)(jrd) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 07/21 4:20 PM
ORDER granting4 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED that the time in which Blue Buffalo must answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended from 7/21/2017 to 8/30/2017. If Blue Buffalo files a motion to dismiss the Complaint, the motion hearing would be scheduled for 11/30/2017 at 2:00 p.m.; Plaintiff will respond to said motion or amend his Complaint by 10/10/2017, and Blue Buffalo will file its reply by 10/30/2017. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/21/2017. (acc) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/20 12:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Celeste Marie Brecht on behalf of Blue Buffalo Pet Products, Inc (Brecht, Celeste)Attorney Celeste Marie Brecht added to party Blue Buffalo Pet Products, Inc(pty:dft) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/20 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca A. Peterson on behalf of Vladi Zakinov(Peterson, Rebecca)Attorney Rebecca A. Peterson added to party Vladi Zakinov (pty:pla) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 07/19 2:56 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by Blue Buffalo Pet Products, Inc. (Gurvitz, Matthew)Attorney Matthew M. Gurvitz added to party Blue Buffalo Pet Products, Inc(pty:dft) Modified on 7/19/2017 to correct event type(acc) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/18 4:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M McKany on behalf of Vladi Zakinov(McKany, Steven)Attorney Steven M McKany added to party Vladi Zakinov (pty:pla) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/26 3:32 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mpl) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/26 3:28 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-10196669.), filed by Vladi Zakinov. The new case number is 3:17-cv-1301-AJB-WVG. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Robbins, Brian)(mpl) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |