Yadkin Bank v. Lindsay, Jr. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:17-bk-50142
Lead BK case is: 6:17-bk-50142
North Carolina Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Lena M James |
Case #: | 6:17-ap-06015 |
Nature of Suit | 1 null |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Bankruptcy Administrator
William P. Miller
Bankruptcy Administrator 101 South Edgeworth Street
Greensboro, NC 27401 |
|
Defendant
B. Clay Lindsay, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Connie Lindsay
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Esby Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BCL One, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yadkin Bank
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/28/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Wed 09/27 2:48 PM
Disposition of Adversary 6:17-ap-6015 (Shoffner, T.) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 09/27 2:52 PM
Adversary Case 6:17-ap-6015 Closed (Shoffner, T.) |
||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 09/14 1:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 09/13/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
5
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Mon 09/11 3:26 PM
Order Remanding Action To State Court Re: . (Whitesell, S.) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Wed 09/06 4:46 PM
Hearing Held (Leonard, J.) |
||
court
Court Minutes no document alt
Thu 09/07 4:04 PM
Court Minutes - Date of Hearing: September 6, 2017. Appearances: George Sanderson, III, Attorney for Plaintiff; Robert Price, Assistant Bankruptcy Administrator ORDERED: Notice of Removal/Complaint will be Remanded to State Court. O - Court (Leonard, J.) |
||
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Generic Motion
Tue 09/05 4:01 PM
Motion for an Order to Show Cause Filed by Yadkin Bank (Sanderson, George) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
audio
Wed 08/23 1:42 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/22/2017 2:05:10 PM ]. File Size [ 2559 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:06 ]. (*1* Status Hearing on Notice of Removal). (admin) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Tue 08/22 3:43 PM
Status Hearing Continued Hearing to be held on 9/6/2017 at 02:00 PM Courtroom, Winston-Salem for1 , (Leonard, J.) |
||
court
Court Minutes no document alt
Tue 08/22 3:46 PM
Court Minutes - Date of Hearing: August 22, 2017. Appearances: George Sanderson, III, Attorney for Plaintiff; Brian Hayes, Attorney for Debtor; B. Clay Lindsay, Debtor; Sarah Bruce, Staff Attorney for Bankruptcy Administrator ORDERED: Status Hearing on Notice of Removal Continued to 9/6/17 at 2:00 p.m. in Winston-Salem, NC. (Leonard, J.) |
||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
Thu 07/20 1:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Notice Date 07/19/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
court
Hearing Set (Other)
Mon 07/17 11:42 AM
Status Hearing Set Hearing scheduled 8/22/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom, Winston-Salem. (Shoffner, T.) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 07/01 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 06/30/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Withdraw As Attorney
Wed 06/28 1:10 PM
Order Granting Motion for Shelley K. Abel and Rayburn Cooper & Durham, P.A., to withdraw as counse (Shoffner, T.) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Generic Motion
Tue 06/27 2:46 PM
ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 6/23/2017; that the motion (ECF No.17 ) is GRANTED, and this matter shall be transferred from the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Middle District of North Carolina. (Shoffner, T.) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Brief/Memorandum
Tue 06/27 2:37 PM
BRIEF re17 MOTION to Refer Proceeding to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Middle District of North Carolina by Plaintiff YADKIN BANK filed by YADKIN BANK. (SANDERSON, GEORGE) (Document filed in USDC, MDNC on 6/20/17) (Shoffner, T.) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Generic Motion
Tue 06/27 2:35 PM
MOTION to Refer Proceeding to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Middle District of North Carolina by YADKIN BANK. Response to Motion due by 7/11/2017 (SANDERSON, GEORGE) (Document filed in USDC, MDNC on 6/20/17) (Shoffner, T.) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
16 | 16
misc
Document (Generic)
Tue 06/27 2:30 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by BCL ONE, LLC, ESBY CORPORATION, B. CLAY LINDSAY, JR, CONNIE LINDSAY. Amendment to15 Memorandum Amended Memorandum in Support of Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (ABEL, SHELLEY). (Document filed in USDC, MDNC on 6/16/17) (Shoffner, T.) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Brief/Memorandum
Tue 06/27 2:28 PM
MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants BCL ONE, LLC, ESBY CORPORATION re14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney SHELLEY KOON ABEL filed by BCL ONE, LLC, ESBY CORPORATION. (ABEL, SHELLEY) (Document filed in USDC, MDNC on 6/15/17)(Shoffner, T.) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Withdraw As Attorney
Tue 06/27 2:25 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney SHELLEY KOON ABEL by on behalf of BCL ONE, LLC, ESBY CORPORATION. (ABEL, SHELLEY) (Document filed in USDC, MDNC on 6/15/17) (Shoffner, T.) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Document (Generic)
Tue 06/27 2:20 PM
ECF 30 Day Notice as to Shelley Koon Abel. (Document filed in USDC, MDNC on 5/9/17) (Shoffner, T.) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Document (Generic)
Tue 06/27 2:19 PM
Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:17-cv-00184. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.(Shoffner, T.) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Generic Motion
Tue 06/27 1:46 PM
Order Granting9 ) Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/3/2017. (Filed in USDC, EDNC on 5/4/17 and transferred to USDC, MDNC on 5/9/17) (Shoffner, T.) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Brief/Memorandum
Tue 06/27 1:41 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding9 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Middle District of North Carolina filed by Yadkin Bank. (Sanderson, George) (Filed in USDC, EDNC on 4/26/17 and transferred to USDC, MDNC on 5/9/17) (Shoffner, T.) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Generic Motion
Tue 06/27 1:38 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case to the Middle District of North Carolina filed by Yadkin Bank (Filed in USDC, EDNC on 4/26/17 and transferred to USDC, MDNC on 5/9/17) (Shoffner, T.) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
misc
Document (Generic)
Tue 06/27 1:30 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding removal of case and requirement to file Notice of Appearance. Served on defendants' counsel via US Mail on April 20, 2017. (Filed in USDC, EDNC on 4/20/17 and transferred to USDC, MDNC on 5/9/17) (Shoffner, T.) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Document (Generic)
Tue 06/27 1:25 PM
Notice filed by Yadkin Bank regarding1 Notice of Removal, Index of Exhibits. (Sanderson, George) (Filed in USDC, EDNC on 4/20/17 and transferred to USDC, MDNC on 5/9/17)(Shoffner, T.) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Document (Generic)
Tue 06/27 1:22 PM
Notice filed by Yadkin Bank regarding1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Exhibit (1) State Notice of Filing) (Sanderson, George)(Filed in USDC, EDNC on 4/19/17 and transferred to USDC, MDNC on 5/9/17)(Shoffner, T.) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 06/27 1:18 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Lauren A. Golden on behalf of Yadkin Bank. (Golden, Lauren) (Filed in USDC, EDNC on 4/19/17 and transferred to USDC, MDNC on 5/9/17) (Shoffner, T.) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Document (Generic)
Tue 06/27 1:14 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Yadkin Bank identifying Corporate Parent First National Bank of Pennsylvania, Corporate Parent F.N.B. Corporation for Yadkin Bank. (Sanderson, George) (Filed in USDC, EDNC on 4/19/17 and transferred to USDC, MDNC on 5/9/17) (Shoffner, T.) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 06/27 1:12 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by George F. Sanderson, III on behalf of Yadkin Bank. (Sanderson, George) (Filed in USDC, EDNC on 4/19/17 and transferred to USDC, MDNC on 5/9/17) (Shoffner, T.) |
|
2 | 2
court
AP Memo
Tue 06/27 2:28 AM
AP Memo - Instructions and Information for Pretrial Scheduling Memorandum. (ADIclerk) |
|
court
Entry (viewable by public)
Tue 06/27 1:28 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL - All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). Additionally, counsel is reminded that all future filings must conform to this court's policies and be in a text searchable format pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Entry in USDC, EDNC on 4/20/17 and transferred to USDC, MDNC on 5/9/17) (Shoffner, T.) |
||
court
Entry (viewable by public)
Tue 06/27 1:43 PM
Motion Submitted to US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle:9 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Middle District of North Carolina. (Entry in USDC, EDNC on 5/2/17 and transferred to USDC, MDNC on 5/9/17) (Shoffner, T.) |
||
court
Entry (viewable by public)
Tue 06/27 2:23 PM
Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. Set flag for Magistrate Judge Joi Elizabeth Peake. (Document filed in USDC, MDNC on 5/9/17) (Shoffner, T.) |
||
court
Entry (viewable by public)
Tue 06/27 2:23 PM
CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Document filed in USDC, MDNC on 5/9/17) (Shoffner, T.) |
||
court
Entry (viewable by public)
Tue 06/27 2:39 PM
Case Reassigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. UNASSIGNED no longer assigned to the case. (Entry filed in USDC, MDNC on 6/22/17) (Shoffner, T.) |
||
court
Entry (viewable by public)
Tue 06/27 2:42 PM
Motions Submitted:14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney SHELLEY KOON ABEL,17 MOTION to Refer Proceeding to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Middle District of North Carolina to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Entry filed in USDC, MDNC on 6/22/17) (Shoffner, T.) |
||
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/26 3:41 PM
Adversary Case 17-6015 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause): Notice of Removal filed by Yadkin Bank. (Notice of Removal filed in USDC, EDNC on 4/19/17 and transferred to USDC, MDNC on 5/9/17) (Shoffner, T.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons | ||
Att: 2 44 pgs Exhibit Verified Complaint | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Notice from Court | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Case Management Order | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Order Extending Case Management Deadlines | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Answer and Counterclaims | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and Reply to Counterclaims | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Designation of Mediator | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Notice of Bankruptcy Filing | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet |