Battery Associates, Inc.
Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Henry W Van Eck |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-02659 |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Aug 02, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 12, 2019 |
Debtor
Battery Associates, Inc.
PO Box 194
New Freedom, PA 17349-0194 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Asst. U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
228 Walnut Street, Suite 1190
Harrisburg, PA 17101 |
|
Trustee
Steven M. Carr (Trustee)
Ream, Carr, Markey and Woloshin LLP 119 East Market Street
York, PA 17401 |
Docket last updated: 06/28/2017 12:03 AM EDT |
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-docket of credit card
Tue 06/27 2:57 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(1:17-bk-02659) [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) filing fee. Receipt number 8414127, amount $ 335.00. . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Tue 06/27 2:53 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual . Filing fee due in the amount of $ 335.00 Filed by Craig S. Sharnetzka of CGA Law Firm on behalf of Battery Associates, Inc.. (Sharnetzka, Craig) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)
Tue 06/27 2:54 PM
Creditor List Uploaded. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by Craig S. Sharnetzka of CGA Law Firm on behalf of Battery Associates, Inc. . (Sharnetzka, Craig) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Employee Income Records (Certification of NO Payment Advices or Pay Stubs or Pay Advices)
Tue 06/27 3:01 PM
Certification of No Payment Advices Filed by Craig S. Sharnetzka of CGA Law Firm on behalf of Battery Associates, Inc.. (Sharnetzka, Craig) |
|
4 | 4
court
Automatic Assignment-Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Tue 06/27 11:30 PM
Meeting of Creditors and Appointment of Trustee Steven M. Carr (Trustee), with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/02/2017 at 01:00 PM at York County Judicial Center, 45 North George Street, 5th Floor Multipurpose Room, York, PA 17401. (Docketer, Automatic) |