Pettibone v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00437 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 27, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 25, 2017 3:33 AM EST |
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LTD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
IRASEMA PETTIBONE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARTIN PETTIBONE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Fri 07/27 1:44 PM
CLERK'S DISMISSAL re7 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice (djb) |
|
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 07/26 3:39 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY. (AGNESHWAR, ANAND) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/14 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Reissued
Thu 08/10 12:43 PM
Summons Reissued as to OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LTD. (djb) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Mon 07/24 8:22 PM
NOTICE of Summons for Issuance by IRASEMA PETTIBONE, MARTIN PETTIBONE (SCHULTE, RICHARD) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/21 8:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by HAL K LITCHFORD on behalf of OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LTD (LITCHFORD, HAL) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/29 3:55 PM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, #1 OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, #2 OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/28 10:50 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-3913116.), filed by Irasema Pettibone. (SCHULTE, RICHARD) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons for Issuance, | ||
Att: 3 Summons for Issuance, | ||
Att: 4 Summons for Issuance | ||
utility
Create Case Association
Thu 06/29 10:54 AM
Cases associated: Create association to 3:16-md-02734-MCR-GRJ. (djb) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 06/29 10:56 AM
CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR and SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON no longer assigned to case. (djb) |