McGinnis et al v. Biomet Orthopedics LLC et al
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert L Miller, Jr |
Referred: | Michael G Gotsch, Sr |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00509 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 25, 2017 4:09 AM EST |
Defendant
Biomet Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Biomet Manufacturing Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Biomet Orthopedics LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Biomet US Reconstruction LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald E McGinnis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glenda McGinnis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
73 | 73
misc
Clerks Judgment
Fri 12/13 2:03 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (jld) |
|
72 | 72
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 12/13 2:02 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to the stipulation to dismiss71 and Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/13/19. (jld) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
71 | 71
motion
Stipulation to Dismiss
Mon 12/09 3:35 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Defendants Biomet US Reconstruction LLC, Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet Manufacturing Corp. (Russo, Stephanie) |