Glackin et al v. Checkr, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph C Spero |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-03691 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 25, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 25, 2017 1:06 AM PST |
Defendant
Checkr, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Glackin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathaniel Roman
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jan 25 2018
ORDER GRANTING 29 STIPULATION DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/25/18. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018) |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 01/25 2:59 PM
ORDER GRANTING 29 STIPULATION DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/25/18. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 01/24 2:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Charles Glackin, Nathaniel Roman. (Sand, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/24/2018) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Tue 01/09 8:21 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Further Case Management Conference, previously set for 3/23/18 at 2:00 PM has been re-set for 3/30/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Any party seeking a continuance shall e-file a stipulation and proposed order. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 12/19 2:17 PM
ORDER re 26 Notice (Other) filed by Checkr, Inc. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed, as modified on 12/19/17, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/19/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2017) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 12/15 4:38 PM
NOTICE by Checkr, Inc. of Case Resolution and [Proposed] Order (Bolson Baarts, Nicole) (Filed on 12/15/2017) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
respoth
Answer to Amended Complaint
Wed 11/15 2:36 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint15 Amended Complaint and Affirmative and Additional Defenses byCheckr, Inc.. (Bolson Baarts, Nicole) (Filed on 11/15/2017) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 10/25 11:32 AM
Order, signed 10/25/17, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 23 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant To Respond to Amended Complaint.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 10/24 12:53 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Defendant Checkr, Inc. to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by Checkr, Inc.. (Bolson Baarts, Nicole) (Filed on 10/24/2017) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Letter
Fri 10/06 2:51 PM
Letter from Plaintiffs and Defendant Regarding Selection of Private Mediator . (Sand, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/6/2017) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Wed 10/04 9:52 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER: Joint letter with name of private mediator and mediation date due 10/6/17. Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/4/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
minutes
Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 10/02 9:40 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/29/2017. Joint letter with name of private mediator and mediation date due 10/6/17. Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. FTR Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Jeff Sand. Defendant Attorney: Nicole Baarts. Attachment: Minute Order. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/2/2017) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 09/25 10:53 AM
Order, signed 9/25/17, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 18 Stipulation to Extend Time For Defendant Checkr to Respond to Amended Complaint.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 09/22 2:40 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Defendant Checkr, Inc. to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by Checkr, Inc.. (Bolson Baarts, Nicole) (Filed on 9/22/2017) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Joint Case Management Statement
Fri 09/22 4:29 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Charles Glackin, Nathaniel Roman. (Sand, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/22/2017) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation selecting Private ADR
Thu 09/21 1:37 PM
Order, signed 9/21/17, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 14 Stipulation selecting Private ADR.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 09/08 1:48 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Checkr, Inc.. Filed byCharles Glackin, Nathaniel Roman. (Sand, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/8/2017) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR
Fri 09/08 1:43 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Charles Glackin, Nathaniel Roman filed by Charles Glackin, Nathaniel Roman. (Sand, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/8/2017) |
|
13 | 13
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Fri 09/08 1:36 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sand, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/8/2017) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 09/08 1:08 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Checkr, Inc... (Bolson Baarts, Nicole) (Filed on 9/8/2017) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 08/03 10:10 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Charles Glackin. Service waived by Checkr, Inc. waiver sent on 7/27/2017, answer due 9/25/2017. (Tatar, Stephanie) (Filed on 8/3/2017) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/26 12:24 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Charles Glackin, Nathaniel Roman.. (Sand, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/26/2017) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/21 9:56 AM
Order, signed 7/21/17, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey B. Sand.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 07/17 12:13 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 7/31/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 7/31/2017. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/14 1:20 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11547488.) filed by Charles Glackin, Nathaniel Roman.(Sand, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/14/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/28 8:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Checkr, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017) |
|
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 06/28 8:47 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 06/28 11:47 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/12/2017. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 06/28 11:19 AM
Proposed Summons. (Tatar, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/28/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 06/28 11:14 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by Charles Glackin, Nathaniel Roman . (Tatar, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/28/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/28 11:12 AM
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Violations of the Fair Credit Reporting Act and the Investigative Consumer Reporting Agencies Act; Demand for Jury Trial against Checkr, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-11506260.). Filed by Charles Glackin, Nathaniel Roman. (Tatar, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/28/2017) Modified on 6/28/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF) |