Hogans et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jean C Hamilton |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01842 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 25, 2017 2:42 AM CST |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Imerys Talc America, Inc.,
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angie Wait
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Micheline Michaud-Schevis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynn Procter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Claudia Rodrigue
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Candy Setzer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carole Sexton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marie Shaut
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Talucci
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather Trujillo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Turner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christy Uzzell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katherine Lett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Washington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marianne Westerman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Wright
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Giannecchini
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth W. Mcelroy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dorothy Patton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Pearson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gina Pfau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gloria Ristesund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lena Elaine Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phyllis Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Gustman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luann Baker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wanda Bennett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Belinda J. Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Surflourinia Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cheryl Caragan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debbie Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vera Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bonnie Di Girolamo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Engelhardt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jill Garrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Irma Gaskin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sara McDowell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Hamby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lykeisha Harrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Molly Hawkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Hogans
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Holden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ginger Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Keesee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cindy King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cindy Armstrong
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joanne Marr
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
misc
Remark
Thu 10/05 1:20 PM
***REMARK - Case transferred from Missouri Eastern has been opened in District of New Jersey as case 3:17-cv-07927, filed 10/05/2017. (DLB) |
||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
67 | 67
3
pgs
order
Order of MDL Transfer
Wed 10/04 3:26 PM
ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: New Jersey. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) |
|
66 | 66
order
Conditional Transfer Order (does not the close the case)
Wed 10/04 9:48 AM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel w/ schedule A attached. Signed by MDL on 10/04/17. (CLA) |