Valley Heavy Haul, Inc.
Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John J Thomas |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-02715 |
Case Filed: | Jun 29, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Aug 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 30, 2018 |
Debtor
Valley Heavy Haul, Inc.
1825 John Brady Dr
Muncy, PA 17756-8138 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Asst. U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
228 Walnut Street, Suite 1190
Harrisburg, PA 17101 |
|
Trustee
Lawrence G. Frank (Trustee)
100 Aspen Drive
Dillsburg, PA 17019 |
Docket last updated: 06/30/2017 12:03 AM EDT |
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-docket of credit card
Thu 06/29 3:41 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(4:17-bk-02715) [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) filing fee. Receipt number 8417759, amount $ 335.00. . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Thu 06/29 3:40 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual . Filing fee due in the amount of $ 335.00 Filed by Daniel J. Rheam on behalf of Valley Heavy Haul, Inc.. (Rheam, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)
Thu 06/29 3:43 PM
Creditor List Uploaded. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by Daniel J. Rheam on behalf of Valley Heavy Haul, Inc. . (Rheam, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Tax Documents
Thu 06/29 3:45 PM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2015 (Document is restricted and can only be viewed by Court staff.) Filed by Daniel J. Rheam on behalf of Valley Heavy Haul, Inc.. (Rheam, Daniel) |
|
4 | 4
court
Automatic Assignment-Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Thu 06/29 11:30 PM
Meeting of Creditors and Appointment of Trustee Lawrence G. Frank (Trustee), with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/16/2017 at 10:00 AM at City Hall, Community Room - 2nd Floor, 245 West 4th Street, Williamsport, PA 17701. (Docketer, Automatic) |