State Farm Fire & Casualty Co v. Titeflex Corporation
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | S Maurice Hicks, Jr |
Referred: | Mark L Hornsby |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00842 |
Nature of Suit | 385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 29, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 26, 2017 2:55 AM CST |
Defendant
Titeflex Corp Gastite Division
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 10/26 12:00 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co and Titeflex Corp Gastite Division. (aty,Heuvel, Douglas) Modified on 10/26/2017 to add filer (FinnSld, P) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Scheduling Order - Hicks
Tue 08/22 4:01 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/22/2018 8:30 AM in Shreveport Court House before Judge S Maurice Hicks. Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2018 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge S Maurice Hicks. Pretrial Order due by 9/13/2018. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 9/29/2017. Witness List due by 12/1/2017. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 3/25/2018. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 5/10/2018. Discovery deadline 3/1/2018. Expert Depositions due by 6/30/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 7/30/2018. Daubert Motions due by 7/30/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order inserts and exhibits exchanged by 8/9/2018. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 8/23/2018. Motions in Limine due by 9/6/2018. Trial Depositions due by 10/1/2018. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 10/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/22/2017. (crt,Delgado, S) |
|
22 | 22
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 08/22 3:57 PM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby: Telephone SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 8/22/2017. (crt,Delgado, S) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Fri 08/11 12:18 PM
RULE 26(f) Report by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co and Titeflex Corp Gastite Division. (aty,Heuvel, Douglas) Modified on 8/11/2017 to add filer (FinnSld, P) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/07 4:49 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Carl E Switzer for Titeflex Corp Gastite Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/7/2017. (crt,FinnSld, P) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/07 4:47 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Matthew Cate for Titeflex Corp Gastite Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/7/2017. (crt,FinnSld, P) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Response to Removal Order
Fri 08/04 2:49 PM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Titeflex Corp Gastite Division .(aty,Homza, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
17 | 17
misc
Corrective Document
Fri 08/04 2:44 PM
CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Corrective Document filed by Titeflex Corp Gastite Division regarding15 Notice of Deficiency,14 Notice of Deficiency, to Appoint Carl Switzer and Matthew Cate Pro Hac Vice .(aty,Homza, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/26 10:09 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co for State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (aty,Pipes, William) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Wed 07/26 9:15 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency to Brian Allen Homza on behalf of Titeflex Corp Gastite Division regarding12 MOTION for Matthew Cate to Appear Pro Hac Vice,13 MOTION for Carl Switzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Reason: The above item requires a certificate of good standing. Please refer to LR83.2.6 for more specific requirements, and An original signature of attorney being admitted Pro Hac Vice is required. Please provide a proper signature page for this document. (crt,FinnSld, P) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Wed 07/26 8:59 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency to Brian Allen Homza on behalf of Titeflex Corp Gastite Division regarding12 MOTION for Matthew Cate to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3421970),13 MOTION for Carl Switzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3421981). Reason: An original signature of attorney being admitted Pro Hac Vice is required. Please provide a proper signature page for this document. (crt,FinnSld, P) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/25 3:41 PM
MOTION for Carl Switzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3421981) by Titeflex Corp Gastite Division. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby.(aty,Homza, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/25 3:38 PM
MOTION for Matthew Cate to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3421970) by Titeflex Corp Gastite Division. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby.(aty,Homza, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/20 3:33 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas C Heuvel for State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/20/2017. (crt,FinnSld, P) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/19 10:09 AM
MOTION for Douglas C. Heuvel to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3416758) by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby.(aty,Pipes, William) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of good standing | ||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Setting Scheduling Conference
Tue 07/11 1:37 PM
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2017 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 8/1/2017. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 8/15/2017. Rule 26 Report due by 8/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/10/2017. (crt,Delgado, S) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Memorandum Order
Fri 07/07 4:40 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER. The court will deem the notice of removal to allege that State Farm is both incorporated in and has its principal place of business in Illinois unless State Farm represents otherwise in the case management report, which will be required by a separate order that sets a scheduling conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/7/2017. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Removal Order
Thu 07/06 10:09 AM
REMOVAL ORDER forwarded to all counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/5/2017. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Exhibit
Mon 07/03 1:02 PM
EXHIBIT re1 Notice of Removal, Clerk's Certificate by Titeflex Corp Gastite Division. (aty,Homza, Brian) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/30 4:10 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Titeflex Corp Gastite Division. (aty,Homza, Brian) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/30 4:09 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Titeflex Corp Gastite Division.(aty,Homza, Brian) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Fri 06/30 10:34 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Fri 06/30 10:30 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Brian Allen Homza on behalf of Titeflex Corporation, Gastite Division. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/14/2017. (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 06/29 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 600633-C with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3403300) filed by Titeflex Corporation, Gastite Division.(Attorney Brian Allen Homza added to party Titeflex Corporation, Gastite Division(pty:dft))(aty,Homza, Brian) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/30 10:13 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge S Maurice Hicks and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M) |