Firetree, Ltd. et al v. Norwalk et al
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Michael P Shea |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01088 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 42:3601 Fair Housing Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 23, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 27, 2017 4:34 AM EST |
Consol Defendant
Gregory Brasher
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
Nadine Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
Andrew Conroy
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
Lee Levey
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
Taylor Strubinger
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
Zoning Board Of Appeals
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of Norwalk
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aline Rochefort
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
William Ireland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Keith Lyon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Harry Rilling
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Wrinn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Firetree, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, December 26, 2019 | ||
181 | 181
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Thu 12/26 5:28 PM
ORDER: In light of the parties' stipulation of dismissal and the Court's order of dismissal, the pending motions133 138 144 and153 are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/26/2019. (Constantine, A.) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2019 | ||
180 | 180
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 12/23 1:15 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case with Prejudice by Gregory Brasher, Nadine Campbell, Andrew Conroy, William Ireland, Lee Levey, Keith Lyon, City of Norwalk, Harry Rilling, Aline Rochefort, Taylor Strubinger, Michael Wrinn, Zoning Board Of Appeals. (McKessy, Scott) |
|
179 | 179
order
Order
Mon 12/23 12:34 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: After the parties reported that they reached an agreement to settle this action and that the settlement would include the withdrawal of the plaintiff's zoning appeal brought under Connecticut General Statutes Sec. 8-8, the Court held a hearing on December 23, 2019, to decide whether to approve the settlement, in accordance with Sec. 8-8(n). Before the hearing, the Court received and reviewed information concerning the proposed settlement, which the Court posted on the docket on December 19, 2019. ECF No. 177. At the hearing, the Court canvassed both counsel concerning the settlement. Having taken these steps and concluded that the settlement is fair and reasonable for the reasons stated on the record at the hearing, the Court approves the settlement, including the withdrawal of the zoning appeal. Therefore, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Rather than continue to keep the case open on the docket, the Clerk is directed administratively to close the file without prejudice to reopening on or before 1/23/20. If the parties wish to file a stipulation of dismissal (for approval by the Court or simply for inclusion in the Courts file), they may do so on or before 1/23/20. The dates set forth in this order may be extended for good cause pursuant to a motion filed in accordance with Local Rule 7. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/23/2019. (Constantine, A.) |
|
178 | 178
minutes
Miscellaneous Hearing
Mon 12/23 12:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael P. Shea: Settlement Approval Hearing held on 12/23/2019. 9 minutes(Court Reporter J. Monette.) (Johnson, D.) |
|
notice
Judicial Evaluation Program Survey
Mon 12/23 1:05 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Johnson, D.) |
||
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
177 | 177
9
pgs
order
Order
Thu 12/19 4:32 PM
ORDER: As discussed in today's telephonic conference, the Court will hold a hearing Monday, 12/23/19 at 10:00 a.m. to consider the parties' proposed settlement in accordance with Conn. Gen. Stat. § 8-8(n). At the hearing, the Court will ask the parties briefly to describe the negotiations leading up to the settlement, the various consideration involved, and the monetary compensation to be paid in connection with the withdrawal of the zoning appeal. During the call, the parties pointed out that if this appeal were in Connecticut state court, it would be governed by Practice Book § 14-7B, which would require no notice or hearing other than this notice and the hearing to be held before the Court on Monday. Specifically, under that provision, the City's zoning board would not be required to give notice or hold a hearing because the settlement contemplates no modification of the zoning decision being challenged; under the proposed settlement, that decision will stand and the appeal will be withdrawn. Although this Practice Book provision is not binding on this Court, I see no reason not to follow it in this case in light of the information concerning the proposed settlement the parties have provided to the Court, which is attached hereto. So I decline to order any notice of the settlement other than this notice or any hearing on the settlement other than the one to be held before the Court on Monday. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/19/19. (Constantine, A.) |
|
176 | 176
order
Order
Thu 12/19 10:06 AM
ORDER : A telephonic conference is scheduled for 12/19/19 at 3:30 pm. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/19/19. (Constantine, A.) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 12/19 11:25 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/19/2019 03:30 PM Hartford, CT before Judge Michael P. Shea (Johnson, D.) |