Burnett v. Cuckler, MD et al
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert L Miller, Jr |
Referred: | Michael G Gotsch, Sr |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00513 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 27, 2017 4:18 AM EST |
Defendant
Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Biomet, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Cuckler, MD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvin Burnett
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
71 | 71
15
pgs
order
Order Transferring Case to Other District
Fri 03/29 12:34 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL TRANSFER ORDER (GROUP 3) AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS Pursuant to the court's prior orders and 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), this case is TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Pennsylvania (Erie Division). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/28/2019. (jld) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2019 | ||
70 | 70
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order Order on Motion to Withdraw
Tue 03/26 3:37 PM
ORDER: GRANTING69 Motion to Withdraw51 Motion for Protective Order; the51 Motion for Protective Order is WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/26/19. (jld) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
69 | 69
motion
Withdraw
Mon 03/25 2:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw51 MOTION for Protective Order Related to Plaintiff's 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice by Defendants Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. (Hanig, Erin) |