MILK INDUSTRY MANAGEMENT CORPORATION v. LANDIS SUPERMARKET, INC.
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Renee Marie Bumb |
Referred: | Joel Schneider |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-04840 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 29, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 26, 2017 3:55 AM EST |
Defendant
LANDIS SUPERMARKET, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only
arbtre
|
|
Plaintiff
MILK INDUSTRY MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 11/14 8:57 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by MILK INDUSTRY MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. (SOBEL, HOWARD) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order 60-Day Administrative Termination
Wed 09/20 3:15 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 11/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/20/17. (js) |
|
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 09/21 11:10 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Settlement Conference held on 9/20/2017. (tf, ) |
||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Tue 08/01 4:25 PM
TEXT ORDER -- It is hereby ORDERED a settlement conference is scheduled on September 20, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. Client representatives with final authority to settle the case shall appear in person. By August 29, 2017, the parties shall exchange the documents and information discussed during the August 1, 2017 conference call. The parties may serve confidential settlement memos just to the Court (not to exceed 5 pages) at least 3 working days before the conference. The parties may attach copies of key documents to the memos. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/1/17. (Schneider, Joel) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 08/02 9:41 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/1/2017. (tf, ) |
||
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Mon 07/31 9:51 AM
TEXT ORDER -- It is hereby ORDERED a conference call is scheduled on August 1, 2017 at 4:00 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall arrange the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/31/17. (Schneider, Joel) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respoth
Response (NOT Motion)
Wed 07/26 2:17 PM
RESPONSE re6 Order. (SOBEL, HOWARD) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Mon 07/24 2:45 PM
TEXT ORDER For good cause shown [Doc. No. 7], the Initial Scheduling Conference on July 26, 2017 is POSTPONED. If necessary, the Court will reschedule the conference after the Court rules on defendant's request for dismissal. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on July 24, 2017. (jk) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Mon 07/24 10:58 AM
Letter from Defense Counsel Melvin R. Shuster, Esquire.(SHUSTER, MELVIN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Fri 07/21 11:32 AM
LETTER ORDER, addressed to Counsel, Re: Pre-Motion Letter. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 7/21/17. (js) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 07/13 10:59 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by All Defendants. Responses due by 7/20/2017(SHUSTER, MELVIN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Fri 06/30 10:08 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (rtm, ) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden)
Fri 06/30 9:55 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 7/26/2017 10:30 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/29/2017. (rtm, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/30 9:49 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by LANDIS SUPERMARKET, INC.. (rtm, ) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 06/30 9:48 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LANDIS SUPERMARKET, INC. from BURLINGTON COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, case number BUR L 1151 17. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7936958), filed by LANDIS SUPERMARKET, INC..(rtm, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Judicial Preferences
Fri 06/30 9:49 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (rtm, ) |
||
utility
Case Referred to Arbitration
Fri 06/30 9:49 AM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (rtm, ) |
||
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Fri 06/30 10:15 AM
Answer Due Deadline Update - The document4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by LANDIS SUPERMARKET, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/20/2017. (rtm, ) |