North Carolina Middle District Court
Judge:Catherine C Eagles
Referred: L Patrick Auld
Case #: 1:17-cv-00610
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 27, 2017 3:43 AM EST
Defendant
DOES 1-18
Represented By
LUKE A. DALTON
Law Firm Of Luke A. Dalton, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
VENICE PI, LLC
9601 Wilshire Blvd., #700
Beverly Hills, CA 90210
Represented By
KATHLEEN M. LYNCH
Lynch Van Sickle, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, January 24, 2018
22 22 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - case Wed 01/24 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff VENICE PI, LLC (LYNCH, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Wed 01/24 10:24 AM
CASE REFERRED RE: Text Order dated 1/2/18, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Sanders, Marlene)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2018
21 21 motion Extension of Time-Other Tue 01/02 2:26 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by VENICE PI, LLC.(LYNCH, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Motions Referred Tue 01/02 2:46 PM
Motions Referred: RE:21 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sanders, Marlene)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other Tue 01/02 4:37 PM
TEXT ORDER (A) granting in part21 Second Motion to Extend Time to Serve Defendants; (B) extending the service of process deadline as to Defendants Doe 2, Doe 3, Doe 6 through Doe 10, Doe 13, Doe 14, Doe 16, and Doe 17 to 01/23/2018; and (C) extending the service of process deadline as to Defendants Doe 12 and Doe 15 to 03/02/2018. Via Text Order dated 10/24/2017, the Court extended the service of process deadline to 12/30/2017, because "Plaintiff should have a reasonable amount of time to make service of process after obtaining compliance with the subpoenas [served on Internet Service Providers]." Plaintiff now has received subpoena responses as to all but Defendants Doe 12 and Doe 15, "has contacted AT&T and requested information pertaining to Does 12 and 15," and has voluntarily dismissed the action as to Defendants Doe 1, Doe 4, Doe 5, Doe 11, and Doe 18. Plaintiff seeks an extension of the service of process deadline to 03/30/2018, for the purpose(s) of obtaining the subpoenaed information from AT&T as to Defendants Doe 12 and Doe 15 and of seeking settlement with those two Defendants, as well as Defendants Doe 2, Doe 3, Doe 6 through Doe 10, Doe 13, Doe 14, Doe 16, and Doe 17. The Court declines to extend the service-of-process deadline to the extent requested by Plaintiff (particularly for the purpose of allowing Plaintiff more time to pursue settlement), but does find good cause for a brief further extension as to Defendants as to whom Plaintiff has obtained subpoenaed information and a longer period as to Defendants as to whom Plaintiff has not yet obtained subpoenaed information. Plaintiff should not anticipate receiving any further extensions of the service-of-process deadline based on a generalized desire to pursue settlement or based on a failure to obtain subpoena responses (at least absent a particularized showing of reasonable efforts to obtain compliance). Failure by Plaintiff to comply with this Text Order shall result in dismissal of this action without prejudice as to any remaining unserved Defendants pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 01/02/2018. (AULD, L.)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Quash Mon 11/27 10:07 AM
TEXT ORDER directing the Clerk to administratively terminate8 Motion to Dismiss and to Strike and10 Motion to Quash, Sever, and Allow Defendant to Proceed Anonymously, in light of19 Amended Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Does 1, 4-5, 11 and 18 and20 Amended Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Does 1, 4-5, 11 and 18, because the Doe Defendant who filed8 Motion and10 Motion is among the Doe Defendants subject to19 Amended Notice and20 Amended Notice. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/27/2017. (AULD, L.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
20 20 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - partys Wed 11/22 9:32 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff VENICE PI, LLC (LYNCH, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2017
19 19 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - partys Mon 11/20 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff VENICE PI, LLC (LYNCH, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2017
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - partys Fri 11/17 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff VENICE PI, LLC (LYNCH, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2017
utility Motions Referred Mon 10/30 10:20 AM
Motions Referred: RE:8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sanders, Marlene)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2017
utility Motions Referred Fri 10/27 11:06 AM
Motions Referred: RE:10 MOTION to Quash Sever, and to Allow Defendant to Proceed Anonymously , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Sanders, Marlene)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2017
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/26 4:53 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendant DOES 1-18, to Response to10 MOTION to Quash Sever, and to Allow Defendant to Proceed Anonymously filed by DOES 1-18. (DALTON, LUKE)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/26 4:29 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendant DOES 1-18, to Response to8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and motion to strike filed by DOES 1-18. (DALTON, LUKE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2017
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other Tue 10/24 12:28 PM
TEXT ORDER granting13 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Defendants and extending the service of process deadline, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), to 12/30/2017. In support of13 Motion, Plaintiff has cited the fact that it has not received service-of-process-related subpoena responses from any Internet Service Providers ("ISPs"). Plaintiff should have a reasonable amount of time to make service of process after obtaining compliance with the subpoenas. Accordingly, the Court the Court finds good cause for the requested extension. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 10/24/2017. (AULD, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2017
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/12 10:07 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 Memorandum filed by DOES 1-18,10 MOTION to Quash Sever, and to Allow Defendant to Proceed Anonymously filed by DOES 1-18 filed by VENICE PI, LLC. Replies due by 10/26/2017(LYNCH, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Unpublished opinions,
Att: 2 Exhibit Unpublished opinion
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/12 10:05 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 Memorandum filed by DOES 1-18,8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DOES 1-18 filed by VENICE PI, LLC. Replies due by 10/26/2017(LYNCH, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Unpublished opinion,
Att: 2 Exhibit Unpublished opinion
Monday, September 25, 2017
utility Motions Referred Mon 09/25 10:24 AM
Motions Referred: RE:13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sanders, Marlene)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2017
13 13 motion Extension of Time-Other Fri 09/22 10:09 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by VENICE PI, LLC.(LYNCH, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, September 21, 2017
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/21 11:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LUKE A. DALTON on behalf of Defendant DOES 1-18 (DALTON, LUKE)
Related: [-]
11 11 10 pgs respm Memorandum Thu 09/21 11:56 PM
MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant DOES 1-18 re10 MOTION to Quash Sever, and to Allow Defendant to Proceed Anonymously filed by DOES 1-18. (DALTON, LUKE)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Quash Thu 09/21 11:54 PM
MOTION to Quash Sever, and to Allow Defendant to Proceed Anonymously by DOES 1-18. Response to Motion due by 10/12/2017(DALTON, LUKE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
9 9 18 pgs respm Memorandum Thu 09/21 11:51 PM
MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant DOES 1-18 re8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DOES 1-18. (DALTON, LUKE)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 09/21 11:49 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by DOES 1-18. Response to Motion due by 10/12/2017(DALTON, LUKE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 09, 2017
7 7 order Order on Motion for Discovery Wed 08/09 1:04 PM
ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 8/9/2017, granting4 Motion for Discovery, as set out herein. (Butler, Carol)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2017
6 6 order Order Mon 07/10 2:29 PM
STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2017
utility Motions Referred Wed 07/05 10:54 AM
Motions Referred: RE:4 First MOTION for Discovery Expedited , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Williamson, Wanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2017
utility Case Assigned Mon 07/03 11:14 AM
Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. Set flag for Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld. (Coyne, Michelle)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Mediation Mon 07/03 11:15 AM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2017
5 5 respm Memorandum Fri 06/30 3:21 PM
MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff Venice PI, LLC re4 First MOTION for Discovery Expedited filed by Venice PI, LLC. (LYNCH, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Discovery Fri 06/30 3:19 PM
First MOTION for Discovery Expedited by Venice PI, LLC. Response to Motion due by 7/21/2017(LYNCH, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/30 3:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Venice PI, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lost Dog Productions, LLC, Corporate Parent Voltage Productions LLC for Venice PI, LLC.. (LYNCH, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/30 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KATHLEEN M. LYNCH on behalf of Plaintiff Venice PI, LLC (LYNCH, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/30 2:48 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2154002.), filed by Venice PI, LLC.(LYNCH, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Copyright Registration Certificate,
Att: 2 Exhibit IP Listing by Doe,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet