Williams v. Burnett et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Susie Morgan |
Referred: | Joseph C Wilkinson, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-06269 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 21, 2017 |
Defendant
Detective Burnett
|
|
Defendant
Tony Mancuso
|
|
Defendant
Unidentified Party
|
|
Plaintiff
Bobby Dwayne Williams
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Case Transferred Out - District
Fri 07/21 1:15 PM
ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the determination of pauper status is deferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana after transfer of this matter to that Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the instant matter be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/21/2017.(mmv) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/19 4:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bobby Dwayne Williams. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cms) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/19 4:16 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Detective Burnett, Tony Mancuso, Unidentified Party filed by Bobby Dwayne Williams.(cms) |
|
Att: 1 Original Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
1 - Notice of Deficient Filing
Fri 06/30 1:51 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 7/21/2017. (clc) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/30 1:48 PM
**DEFICIENT** COMPLAINT with jury demand against Detective Burnett, Tony Mancuso filed by Bobby Dwayne Williams.(clc) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |