California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward M Chen
Case #: 3:17-cv-03789
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2017 2:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Zenimax Media Inc.
Plaintiff
Dion DiMucci
Represented By
Steven Ames Brown
Entertainment Law
contact info

Docket last updated: 11/17/2017 11:59 PM PST
Friday, November 17, 2017
43 43 adr ADR Remark Fri 12:12 PM
ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference set for December 19, 2017, has been RESCHEDULED to December 20, 2017, at 2:00 PM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2017
42 42 oth_sup Declaration in Opposition Mon 1:11 PM
DECLARATION of STEVEN AMES BROWN in Opposition to41 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byDion DiMucci. Related [+] (Brown, Steven) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
Related: [-] 41
41 41 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 1:10 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byDion DiMucci.(Brown, Steven) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
Related: [-] 38 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay this Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof
Att: 1 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 09, 2017
40 40 adr ADR Remark Thu 11:29 AM
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference scheduled on November 13, 2017 at 10:30 AM Pacific time is rescheduled to December 19, 2017 at 10:00 AM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2017
39 39 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Thu 3:00 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re38 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay this Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byZenimax Media Inc.. Related [+] (Lowe, Rachel) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
Related: [-] 38
38 38 motion Compel Thu 2:59 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay this Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Zenimax Media Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/9/2017. Replies due by 11/16/2017.(Lowe, Rachel) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of J. Griffin Lesher in Support of ZeniMax Media's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay this Action,
Att: 2 Declaration of Rachel E. K. Lowe in Support of ZeniMax Media's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay this Action,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting ZeniMax Media's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismissing this Action
Tuesday, October 24, 2017
37 37 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 11:02 AM
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 13 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2017
36 36 misc Transcript Thu 1:28 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/12/17, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
Related: [-] 35 Transcript Order (s)35
Friday, October 13, 2017
35 35 misc Transcript Order Fri 11:54 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 12, 2017 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Zenimax Media Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Lowe, Rachel) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
Related: [-]
34 34 minutes Motion Hearing Fri 9:31 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 10/12/2017 re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Zenimax Media Inc. (Total Time in Court: 16 minutes.) (Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/13/2017)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 9:34 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 12/14/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 12/21/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2017
33 33 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Thu 2:50 PM
REPLY in Support Related [+] Defendant ZeniMax Media Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byZenimax Media Inc.. (Lowe, Rachel) (Filed on 9/21/2017) Modified on 9/21/2017 (fff, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] 13 MOTION to Dismiss
Friday, September 15, 2017
32 32 adr ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference Fri 12:58 PM
*** FILED IN ERROR - PLEASE DISREGARD - SEE DKT #31 FOR CORRECT NOTICE *** ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on November 13, 2017 at 11:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017) Modified on 9/15/2017 (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
31 31 adr ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference Fri 12:53 PM
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on November 13, 2017 at 10:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
30 30 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 2:45 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Brown, Steven) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
Related: [-]
29 29 adr Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) Wed 2:35 PM
NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Lowe, Rachel) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
Related: [-]
28 28 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 2:33 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lowe, Rachel) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2017
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Mon 5:24 PM
NOTICE by Dion DiMucci re23 Case Management Scheduling Order, proof of service (Brown, Steven) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Proposed Order Mon 3:08 PM
Proposed Order re24 Opposition/Response to Motion by Dion DiMucci. (Brown, Steven) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
Related: [-]
25 25 oth_sup Declaration in Opposition Mon 3:03 PM
DECLARATION of Steven Ames Brown in Opposition to13 MOTION to Dismiss (Erroneously filed as attachment to Dkt. 24) filed byDion DiMucci. Related [+] (Brown, Steven) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
Related: [-] 13
24 24 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 2:02 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byDion DiMucci.(Brown, Steven) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
Related: [-] 13 MOTION to Dismiss
Att: 1 Declaration Brown Declaration
Thursday, September 07, 2017
23 23 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 2:02 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2017. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/7/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
Related: [-]
22 22 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 1:56 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE as to13 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/14/2017. Replies due by 9/21/2017. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
Related: [-]
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 12:34 PM
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Nading) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 12:32 PM
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Lipkin) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 12:31 PM
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Ford) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2017
18 18 oth_sup Re-notice motion Wed 2:52 PM
Renotice motion hearing re13 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ZeniMax Media Inc.'s Amended Notice of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byZenimax Media Inc.. Related [+] (Lowe, Rachel) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
Related: [-] 13
Tuesday, September 05, 2017
17 17 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 9:03 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/5/2017.(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Sunday, July 02, 2017
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Sun 11:55 AM
Proposed Summons. (Brown, Steven) (Filed on 7/2/2017)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Sun 11:54 AM
COMPLAINT against Zenimax Media Inc.. Filed byDion DiMucci.(Brown, Steven) (Filed on 7/2/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet