Hernandez v. The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael R Barrett |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00456 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Jul 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 01, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 30, 2017 4:21 AM EST |
Defendant
Major League Baseball Blue, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angel Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
utility
Remark
Wed 10/03 9:47 AM
***Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:18-cv-09035, filed 10/03/2018. (er) |
||
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District
Mon 10/01 8:06 AM
Case transferred to District of Southern District of New York.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (jlw) |
||
Sunday, September 30, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
11
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Sun 09/30 1:13 PM
ORDER granting in part re8 Defendants Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of New York; in lieu of dismissal, this matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/29/18. (ba) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 05/08 8:22 AM
Minute entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett on 5/7/2018: Joseph Landen and Kevin Murphy appeared for Plaintiff; Michael Glassman, Rachel Philion, and Neil Abramson appeared for Defendant; subject to Defendant's continuing objection to the Court's personal jurisdiction, the Parties are to move forward with generalized discovery; order on pending motion to dismiss (Doc.8 ) will follow. (mr) |
||
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 04/24 8:45 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Please be aware that the Status Conference set for 5/8/18 is RESET to 5/7/2018 at 01:00 PM and remains set by teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett; NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 4/23/18 for conferencing instructions (ba) |
||
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
27
pgs
misc
Transcript
Mon 12/18 5:12 PM
Transcript of Proceedings, Hearing on Motion to Dismiss, held on December 11, 2017, before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Court Reporter/Transcriber Maryann T. Maffia, Telephone number 513-564-7677. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 1/8/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2018. (Maffia, Maryann) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
Motion Hearing
Mon 12/11 12:34 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Motion Hearing held on 12/11/2017 re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Major League Baseball Blue, Inc., The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball; Counsel present; order to follow. (Court Reporter: Maryann Maffia) (ba) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Thu 11/09 8:52 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; Please be aware that a Motion Hearing is set for 12/11/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 109 - Cincinnati before Judge Michael R. Barrett. (ba) |
||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 10/06 12:13 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Major League Baseball Blue, Inc., The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball. (Abramson, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Joe Torre | ||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 09/22 5:44 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Angel Hernandez. (Murphy, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit | ||
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/06 2:14 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel S. Philion for Defendants. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/5/17. (ba) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/06 2:13 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Neil H. Abramson for Defendants. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/5/17. (ba) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
3
pgs
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 09/01 3:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Major League Baseball Blue, Inc., The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball. (Glassman, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 27 pgs Memorandum In Support Of Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Or In The Alternative To TransferVenue To The Southern District Of New York, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Declaration Of Peter Woodfork, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Fri 09/01 3:18 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6106713) of Rachel S. Philion by Defendants Major League Baseball Blue, Inc., The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball. (Glassman, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Fri 09/01 3:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6106660) of Neil H. Abramson by Defendants Major League Baseball Blue, Inc., The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball. (Glassman, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/01 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Samuel Glassman for Defendants Major League Baseball Blue, Inc., The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball (Glassman, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 08/29 10:00 AM
Set Deadlines per doc.4 : Major League Baseball Blue, Inc. answer due 9/1/2017. (eh) |
||
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 08/28 3:18 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Angel Hernandez re2 Summons Issued,1 Complaint, (Murphy, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service to Major League Baseball Blue, Inc. | ||
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Clerk
Fri 08/11 3:42 PM
CERTIFICATE of Clerk: Certified mailing of summons and complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (bjc) |
|
Att: 1 Certified Mail Receipt | ||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/05 7:53 AM
Summons Issued as to Major League Baseball Blue, Inc., The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball. (jlw) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 07/05 7:49 AM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw) |
||
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
22
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/03 1:59 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6023597), filed by Angel Hernandez. (Murphy, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Notice of Right to Sue (The Office of the Commissioner of Baseball), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Notice of Right to Sue (Major League Baseball Blue, Inc.), | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Form, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Form |