Milton Clyde Walker, Jr. and Karen Lynette Walker
Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 13 | |
Judge: | James R Sacca |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-61756 |
Case Filed: | Jul 05, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Aug 10, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Nov 08, 2017 |
Debtor
Milton Clyde Walker, Jr.
1128 Arden Dr SW
Marietta, GA 30008-3504 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Karen Lynette Walker
1128 Arden Drive, SW
Marietta, GA 30008 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Nancy J. Whaley
Nancy J. Whaley Standing Chapter 13 Trustee 303 Peachtree Center Avenue Suite 120
Atlanta, GA 30303 |
Docket last updated: 08/18/2017 12:06 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 12 pgs Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) for Individual(s), Fee $ 310 Filed by Nichole R. James of Wright, James & Boston, P.C. on behalf of Milton Clyde Walker Jr., Karen Lynette Walker. Government Proof of Claim due by 1/2/2018. (James, Nichole) | |
2 | 2 Statement of Social Security Number (Official Form B121) (Document is restricted and can only be viewed by Court staff.) filed by Nichole R. James on behalf of Karen Lynette Walker, Milton Clyde Walker Jr.. (James, Nichole) | |
3 | 3 Credit Counseling Service Certificate filed by Nichole R. James on behalf of Milton Clyde Walker Jr.. (James, Nichole) | |
4 | 4 Credit Counseling Service Certificate filed by Nichole R. James on behalf of Karen Lynette Walker. (James, Nichole) | |
5 | 5 Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) 17-61756 [misc,1023aty] ( 310.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 45271753. Fee Amount 310.00 (U.S. Treasury) | |
6 | 6 Notice of Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 13) 341 Meeting to be held on 08/10/2017 at 02:30 PM at Hearing Room 368, Atlanta. Objections for Discharge due by 10/10/2017. Non-Government Proof of Claims due by 11/08/2017.Confirmation Hearing to be held on 09/19/2017 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 1404, Atlanta. If applicable, a hearing on the Allowance and Approval of Debtor's Counsel Attorney Fees will be held with the Confirmation Hearing. (Admin.) |