Vanderhall Exotics of Houston and Barclays Bank PLC
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey P Norman |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-34196 |
Case Filed: | Jul 05, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Oct 25, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Nov 13, 2017 |
Converted: | Jul 24, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
VANDERHALL EXOTICS OF HOUSTON, L.L.C.
12978 Sugar Ridge Blvd
Stafford, TX 77477-3147 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Vanderhall Exotics of Houston
12978 Sugar Ridge Blvd
Stafford, TX 77477-3147 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Barclays Bank PLC
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP 1200 17th Street Suite 3000
Denver, CO 80202 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard Backest
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dimitriaus Peterson
|
Represented By
|
Trustee
Randy W Williams
Byman & Associates PLLC 7924 Broadway Suite 104
Pearland, TX 77581 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/13/2024 4:20 PM CDT |