Riot Games, Inc. v. Shanghai Moonton Technology Co., Ltd. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Suzanne H Segal |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-04986 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 02, 2018 12:51 AM PST |
Defendant
Shanghai Moonton Technology Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Riot Games, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, August 18, 2022 | ||
61 | 61
notice
Related Case(s)
Thu 08/18 12:01 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Shanghai Moonton Technology Co., Ltd.. Related Case(s): 2:22-cv-3107 DMG(JPRx) (Ybarra, Michelle) |
|
Wednesday, August 17, 2022 | ||
60 | 60
notice
Appearance
Wed 08/17 11:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher S Sun on behalf of Defendant Shanghai Moonton Technology Co., Ltd. (Attorney Christopher S Sun added to party Shanghai Moonton Technology Co., Ltd.(pty:dft))(Sun, Christopher) |
|
59 | 59
notice
Appearance
Wed 08/17 11:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edward Andrew Bayley on behalf of Defendant Shanghai Moonton Technology Co., Ltd. (Attorney Edward Andrew Bayley added to party Shanghai Moonton Technology Co., Ltd.(pty:dft))(Bayley, Edward) |