Fyre Festival LLC
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Martin Glenn |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11883 |
Case Filed: | Jul 07, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 04, 2018 |
Claims Deadline: | Jan 22, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 05, 2021 |
Debtor
Fyre Festival LLC
52 Lispenard Street TH1
New York, NY 10011 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Sunday Oct 01, 2017 10:21 AM EDT |
Petitioning Creditor
John Nemeth
90 Broad Street, 23rd Floor
New York, NY 10004 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Raul Jimenez
90 Broad Street, 23rd Floor
New York, NY 10004 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Andrew Newman
90 Broad Street, 23rd Floor
New York, NY 10004 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Gregory M. Messer
Law Offices of Gregory Messer, PLLC 26 Court Street Suite 2400
Brooklyn, NY 11242 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 05/14/2018 11:10 AM EDT |
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Fri 07/07 1:28 PM
Receipt of Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-11883 [misc,826] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11948715. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
5
pgs
misc
Involuntary Petition Chapter 7 (Fee)
Fri 07/07 1:26 PM
Involuntary Petition Against A Non-Individual (Chapter 7) (Fee Amount $ 335.) Against: Fyre Festival LLC. Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s): John Nemeth (attorney Robert Knuts), Raul Jimenez (attorney Robert Knuts), Andrew Newman (attorney Robert Knuts). (Knuts, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
1
pgs
misc
Auto Summons in an Involuntary Case (BK Only)(Involuntary)
Fri 07/07 3:30 PM
Summons To Debtor In Involuntary Case (Ortiz, Carmen). |