Boyer v. AMPC, Inc. et al
Iowa Southern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Jarvey |
Referred: | Ross A Walters |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00248 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 03, 2018 3:09 AM CST |
Defendant
Essentia Protein Solutions
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AMPC Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leah Boyer
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
A&B Process Systems Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff
AMPC Inc
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff
Essentia Protein Solutions
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/15 2:18 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (31 in 4:17-cv-00023-RAW) Stipulation filed by Manuel Ruiz, (17 in 4:17-cv-00248-JAJ-RAW) Stipulation filed by Leah Boyer. See order for particulars. Clerk to close cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 11/15/2017. (kln) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 11/15 3:55 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per Order18 . (sjc) |
||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation
Tue 11/14 10:27 AM
STIPULATION re10 Order,9 Reply to Response, Stipulated Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (FRCP Rule 41(a)(2)) by Leah Boyer. (Cook, James) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 11/13 3:41 PM
TEXT ORDER granting12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Harry N. Arger; granting13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Heather L. Kramer. Signed by Clerk of Court John Courter on 11/13/2017. (kjw) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 11/13 3:36 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by A&B Process Systems Corp.. Responses due by 11/27/2017. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Brommel, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Brief in Support | ||
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT
Fri 11/10 4:13 PM
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by A&B Process Systems Corp.. (Brommel, Rebecca) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)
Fri 11/10 4:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by A&B Process Systems Corp.. (Brommel, Rebecca) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)
Fri 11/10 4:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by A&B Process Systems Corp.. (Brommel, Rebecca) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 11/10 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca A Brommel on behalf of A&B Process Systems Corp. (Brommel, Rebecca) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/07 4:48 PM
ORDER re (6 in 4:17-cv-00248-JAJ-RAW) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Leah Boyer, (9 in 4:17-cv-00248-JAJ-RAW) Reply to Response, filed by Leah Boyer, (29 in 4:17-cv-00023-RAW) Brief/Other, filed by Manuel Ruiz -- see order for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 11/7/2017. (kln) |
|
9 | 9
respm
Reply
Tue 11/07 2:46 PM
REPLY Plaintiff's Supplemental Reply to Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant AMPC's Partial Resistance to Motion to Consolidate/Alternative Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (FRCP Rule 41(a)(2)) re6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Leah Boyer.(Cook, James) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Reply
Mon 11/06 2:12 PM
REPLY to Defendant AMPC's Partial Resistance to Motion to Consolidate re6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Leah Boyer.(Cook, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H | ||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response/Resistance to Motion
Fri 11/03 10:23 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by AMPC Inc, Essentia Protein Solutions. Replies due by 11/13/2017.(Clausen, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Consolidate Cases
Wed 10/18 4:03 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Leah Boyer.Motions referred to Ross A Walters(R). Responses due by 11/1/2017. If service was made under FRCP 5(b)(2)(C) (mail), (D) (leaving with the clerk of court), or (F) (by delivering by other means consented to in writing), an additional three days is added after the period would otherwise expire under FRCP 6(a). The additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Cook, James) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support | ||
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT
Mon 10/16 2:33 PM
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by AMPC Inc, Essentia Protein Solutions. (Clausen, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 09/20 10:42 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by AMPC Inc; A&B Process Systems Corp. waiver served on 9/12/2017, answer due 11/13/2017. (Clausen, Timothy) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 09/15 11:17 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 10/16/2017. Summons for third party defendant and LR 7.1 packet emailed to counsel. (kjw) |
||
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint Third Party Complaint
Mon 09/11 4:52 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against A&B Process Systems Corp. by AMPC Inc.(Clausen, Timothy) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 07/21 11:05 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Leah Boyer; AMPC Inc waiver served on 7/12/2017, answer due 9/11/2017; Essentia Protein Solutions waiver served on 7/12/2017, answer due 9/11/2017. (Cook, James) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 07/13 3:03 PM
Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) added. Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams no longer assigned to case. (don, ) |
||
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/07 10:41 AM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3247434., filed by Leah Boyer. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 10/5/2017. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 11/6/2017.(Cook, James) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |