Leason Ellis LLP v. Patent & Trademark Association Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kenneth M Karas |
Case #: | 7:17-cv-05185 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 06, 2018 4:07 AM EST |
Defendant
Patent & Trademark Association Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Leason Ellis LLP
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 12/27 3:43 PM
ORDER: granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/27/2017) (ap) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 12/22 7:45 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadline to Reopen Action addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Peter Sloane dated 12/22/2017. Document filed by Leason Ellis LLP.(Sloane, Peter) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Endorsed Letter
Mon 11/20 5:57 PM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Peter Sloane dated 11/17/2017 re: Counsel writes to update the Court as to the status of the matter. ENDORSEMENT: The deadline to reopen is extended to December 23, 2017. The Consent Judgment is invalid as it is not signed by an attorney representing Defendant. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/20/2017) (mml) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Tue 10/24 4:11 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised that all claims asserted herein have been settled, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby dismissed and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within thirty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed within thirty days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purpose~ of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same thirty day period to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per Paragraph 4(B) of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are denied. All conferences are vacated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/24/2017) (ap) |
|
misc
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk
Tue 10/24 4:11 PM
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:12 Order of Dismissal to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (ap) |
||
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Mon 10/23 11:26 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Peter S. Sloane dated October 23, 2017 re: Status Update. Document filed by Leason Ellis LLP.(Sloane, Peter) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 08/31 10:48 AM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted. SO ORDERED. Patent & Trademark Association Inc. answer due 9/22/2017. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/30/2017) (mml) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 08/22 2:27 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Peter S. Sloane dated August 22, 2017. Document filed by Leason Ellis LLP.(Sloane, Peter) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Thu 08/17 3:02 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Patent & Trademark Association Inc. served on 8/2/2017, answer due 8/23/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Leason Ellis LLP.(Sloane, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (U.S. Certified Mail Receipts) | ||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Patent & Trademark Association Inc. (vf) | |
4 | 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Leason Ellis LLP.(Sloane, Peter) | |
3 | 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Patent & Trademark Association Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Leason Ellis LLP. (Sloane, Peter) | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sloane, Peter) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Patent & Trademark Association Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13877219)Document filed by Leason Ellis LLP.(Sloane, Peter) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A (INTA Warning), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B (PTMA Website), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C (Non-USPTO Solicitations), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D (PTMA Solicitation Example), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E (PTMA Database Entry Example) | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (vf) | ||
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (vf) | ||
Case Designated ECF. (vf) | ||
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Peter Samuel Sloane to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (vf) |