NEOPS Holdings, LLC, et al
Connecticut Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Ann M Nevins |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-31017 |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2019 |
Plan Confirmed: | Feb 09, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
NEOPS Holdings, LLC
16 Commercial St
Branford, CT 06405-2801 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U. S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee Giaimo Federal Building 150 Court Street, Room 302
New Haven, CT 06510 |
1. | New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (stamfordadvocate.com) |
Submitted Thu 08/03/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
526 | 526
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 04/19 11:52 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Rodriguez, Gretchen) |