New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 3:17-bk-31017
Lead case is: 3:17-bk-31017
Connecticut Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Ann M Nevins |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-31018 |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC
16 Commercial St
Branford, CT 06405-2801 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U. S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee Giaimo Federal Building 150 Court Street, Room 302
New Haven, CT 06510 |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 04/19 12:07 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Wilson, Sidney) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors
Wed 10/11 4:05 PM
Amended List of Creditors.. Fee Amount $31. Filed by Joanna M. Kornafel on behalf of New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC Debtor, . (Kornafel, Joanna) |
|
crditcrd
none
Wed 10/11 4:07 PM
Receipt of Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors 17-31018 [misc,amdsch] ( 31.00) filing fee - $ 31.00. Receipt number 7944718. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 10/04 3:49 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Joanna M. Kornafel on behalf of New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC Debtor, . (Kornafel, Joanna) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors
Wed 10/04 10:15 AM
Amended Schedules AB, D, EF, G,. Fee Amount $31., Amended Statements - Statement of Affairs. Filed by Joanna M. Kornafel on behalf of New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC Debtor, . (Kornafel, Joanna) |
|
crditcrd
none
Wed 10/04 10:17 AM
Receipt of Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors 17-31018 [misc,amdsch] ( 31.00) filing fee - $ 31.00. Receipt number 7933993. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors
Fri 08/25 3:32 PM
Amended Schedules EF,. to Add Creditors with Certificate of Service Fee Amount $31. Filed by Joanna M. Kornafel on behalf of New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC Debtor, . (Kornafel, Joanna) |
|
crditcrd
none
Fri 08/25 3:35 PM
Receipt of Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors 17-31018 [misc,amdsch] ( 31.00) filing fee - $ 31.00. Receipt number 7871774. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules
Fri 07/28 9:16 PM
Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules , Equity Security Holders , Schedules include AB, D, EF, G, H, , Statement of Corporate Ownership, Statement of Financial Affairs , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual Filed by James Berman on behalf of New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC Debtor, . (Berman, James) |
|
Saturday, July 15, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 07/16 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 07/15/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 07/15 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 07/14/2017. (Admin.) |
|
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 07/15 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 07/14/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
audio
Digital Audio Recording
Wed 07/12 7:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/12/2017 4:03:41 PM ]. File Size [ 27127 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:15:21 ]. (courtspeak) |
|
19 | 19
order
Joint Administration
Wed 07/12 6:11 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration . (Esposito, Pamela) |
|
18 | 18
court
Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal
Wed 07/12 3:18 PM
Deficiency Notice and Notice of Dismissal of Case for Failure to Cure Deficiency:. (Rai, Sujata) |
|
17 | 17
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12
Wed 07/12 3:16 PM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/1/2017 at 03:00 PM at Office of the UST. Proofs of Claims due by 10/30/2017. (Rai, Sujata) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 07/12 2:35 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Thomas J. Sansone on behalf of TECUM CAPITAL PARTNERS f/k/a F.N.B. CAPITAL PARTNERS Creditor, . (Sansone, Thomas) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Employ
Wed 07/12 2:05 PM
Application to Employ Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C. as Attorneys for the Debtor Filed by James Berman on behalf of New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC, Debtor. (Berman, James) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of James Berman | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Wed 07/12 12:40 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by James Berman on behalf of New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC Debtor, . (Berman, James) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 07/12 12:29 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Joanna M. Kornafel on behalf of New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC Debtor, . (Kornafel, Joanna) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Supplemental Document
Wed 07/12 12:07 PM
Supplemental Document Second Amended Exhibit A - DIP Budget Filed by Joanna M. Kornafel on behalf of New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC Debtor, . (Kornafel, Joanna) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 07/12 10:32 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Richard J. Bernard on behalf of Southern Prosthetic Supply Creditor, . (Bernard, Richard) |
|
court
Entry
Wed 07/12 6:15 PM
An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases of NEOPS Holdings, LLC and its affiliate and the docket and case number 17-31017 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (Esposito, Pamela) |
||
court
Hearing Held
Mon 07/24 8:56 AM
Hearing Held; On July 12, 2017, the court entered an order directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases of NEOPS Holdings, LLC and its affiliates. The docket of case number 17-31017 should be consulted for the resolution of the motions filed as ECF Nos. 2, 3, and 4 in 17-31018 17-31019 17-31020 17-31021 and 17-31022 . (Esposito, Pamela) |
||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
5
pgs
motion
Joint Administration
Tue 07/11 6:46 PM
Motion for Joint Administration With 17-31017 Filed by Joanna M. Kornafel on behalf of New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC, Debtor. (Kornafel, Joanna) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
order
Expedite Hearing
Tue 07/11 5:17 PM
Order Granting Motion Expedite Hearing Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Borrowing Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363(b)(1), 363(c), 364(c), and 364(d) With Priority Over Administrative Expenses and Secured By Liens On Property of the Estate Filed by James Berman on b, Motion To Use Pre-Petition Bank Accounts Filed by James Berman on behalf of New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC, Debtor, Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll , Salaries, and Related Items; to Pay Health Insurance Benefits and Related Benefits; to Reimburse Pre-Petition Employee Business Expenses; and to Make Payments for Which Payroll Deductions Were Made Filed Hearing to be held on 7/12/2017 at 03:30 PM at United States Bankruptcy Court, 157 Church Street, 18th Floor, Courtroom, New Haven, CT. (Esposito, Pamela) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Supplemental Document
Tue 07/11 4:49 PM
Supplemental Document Amended Exhibit A - DIP Budget Filed by Joanna M. Kornafel on behalf of New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC Debtor, . (Kornafel, Joanna) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 07/11 4:08 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Joanna M. Kornafel on behalf of New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC Debtor, . (Kornafel, Joanna) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Supplemental Document
Tue 07/11 3:55 PM
Supplemental Document Schedule A Filed by James Berman on behalf of New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC Debtor, . (Berman, James) |
|
5 | 5
3
pgs
motion
Expedite Hearing
Tue 07/11 2:38 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by James Berman on behalf of New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC, Debtor, Motion to Limit Notice Filed by James Berman on behalf of New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC, Debtor (Berman, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
motion
Pay Pre-Petition Payroll
Tue 07/11 2:35 PM
Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll , Salaries, and Related Items; to Pay Health Insurance Benefits and Related Benefits; to Reimburse Pre-Petition Employee Business Expenses; and to Make Payments for Which Payroll Deductions Were Made Filed by James Berman on behalf of New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC, Debtor. (Berman, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
motion
Motion to Use...
Tue 07/11 2:34 PM
Motion To Use Pre-Petition Bank Accounts Filed by James Berman on behalf of New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC, Debtor. (Berman, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
motion
Use Cash Collateral
Tue 07/11 2:32 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Borrowing Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363(b)(1), 363(c), 364(c), and 364(d) With Priority Over Administrative Expenses and Secured By Liens On Property of the Estate Filed by James Berman on behalf of New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC, Debtor. (Berman, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order Exhibit F | ||
1 | 1
54
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 07/11 12:17 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Fee to be Paid by Internet Credit Card. Atty Disclosure Statement Re: 2016(b), List of Equity Security Holders, Schedule A/B-J, Statement of Corporate Ownership, Statement of Financial Affairs, Summary of Assets and Liabilities due by 07/25/2017. Filed by New England Orthotic and Prosthetic Systems, LLC. (Berman, James) |
|
crditcrd
none
Tue 07/11 5:10 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-31018 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) filing fee - $1717.00. Receipt number 7794927. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
utility
Add Judge
Tue 07/11 5:14 PM
Ann M. Nevins added to case. (Esposito, Pamela) |